Burnham v. Young

Plaintiff: Kristen Burnham
Defendant: Richard Alan Young
Case Number: 2:2007cv08017
Filed: July 20, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 20, 2011 197 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 195 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/20/2011.(NVO)
September 19, 2011 192 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AND ORDER that the Court finds in favor of Defendant United States of America on the merits in this case. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendant and terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/19/11. (LSP)
July 20, 2009 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 101 Motion for Summary Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot Motions 111 Motion to Strike; 114 Motion to Strike; 116 Motion to Strike. FURTHER ORDERED Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/20/09. (MAP)
December 22, 2008 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 50 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 58 Motion for Sanctions; denying 59 Motion to Dismiss Case; denying 69 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/22/2008.(NVJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burnham v. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Burnham
Represented By: Walter L Boyaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Alan Young
Represented By: Suzanne M Chynoweth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?