Kellar v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Ivy Ann Kellar
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 2:2008cv00004
Filed: January 2, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2008 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pla's 1st 21 Motion to Enlarge Time to File a Response to Dft's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply to Dft's Response to Pla's Motion for Summary Judgment. Pla's Response is due by Friday, 1/9/09. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 12/8/2008.(LAD)
October 17, 2008 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Late Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff may file her Motion for SummaryJudgment on 10/15/08. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/17/08.(LSP)
October 3, 2008 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Pla's 13 Stipulation/Motion for Enlargement of Time to file a Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/03/08. (ESL)
September 2, 2008 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file her Motion for Summary Judgment no later than September 29, 2008.. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/2/08.(DMT, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kellar v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivy Ann Kellar
Represented By: Eric Glenn Slepian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?