Kruska v. Ochoa et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Jan E. Kruska sued Perverted Justice Foundation Incorporated (www.corporatesexoffenders.com and wikisposure project), Xavier Von Erck a/k/a Phillip John Eide, Christopher Brocious (absolutezerounited.blogspot.com, absolutezerounited.com and absolutezerounited.org), Barbara W. Ochoa a/k/a Petra Luna, Filmax Inc. (www.jankruska.com and www.jankruska.net), April Butler, David M. Butler, Godaddy.com, Bob Parsons, and MySpace.com. Plaintiff seeks to enjoin Defendants from posting on their website claims that Plaintiff is a predator, pedophile, child molester and pro-pedophile. Plaintiff also charges defendants with intentional infliction of emotional distress, defamation, cyberstalking and violation of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act.

Plaintiff: Jan E Kruska
Defendant: Xavier Von Erck, Barabara W Ochoa, Filmax Incorporated, Bob Parsons, MySpace.com, Unknown Parties, Christopher Brocious, Petra Luna, David M Butler, Perverted Justice Foundation Incorporated.Org, Phillip John Eide, GoDaddy.com and April Butler
Case Number: 2:2008cv00054
Filed: January 10, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2011 Filing 296 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED by way of this Court having granted Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment this action is dismissed. Plaintiff shall take nothing. Signed on 4/5/11. (KMG)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 282). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery (Doc.292). Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 4/4/11.(KMG)
April 1, 2011 Filing 294 NOTICE- Judicial Notice/Notice of Errata by Jan E Kruska re #293 Reply to Response to Motion re 282 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (KMG)
March 30, 2011 Filing 293 REPLY to Response to Motion re #282 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Christopher Brocious. (Ford, Steven)
March 21, 2011 Filing 292 MOTION for Discovery in Accordance with F.R.C.P. Rule 26 by Jan E Kruska. (KMG)
March 15, 2011 Filing 291 AFFIDAVIT of Jan Kruska as to re #283 Statement by Plaintiff Jan E Kruska. (DMT)
March 15, 2011 Filing 290 RESPONSE to Motion re #282 defendant Brocious' MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jan E Kruska. (DMT)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER Striking #288 defendant's Reply to Response to Motion. Defendant may file a reply within 14 days after service of Plaintiff's response. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 2/28/11. (DMT)
February 25, 2011 Filing 288 STRICKEN by (Doc. 289) - REPLY to Response to Motion re #282 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Christopher Brocious. (McCaskill, Randy) Modified on 3/1/2011 (DMT).
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER Stricking #286 Plaintiff's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment. That Plaintiff comply with the Local Rules and file a response to #282 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, including a document admitting or denying the facts presented in Defendant's Statement of Undisputed Facts together with supporting affidavits or other appropriate exhibits, no later than March 18, 2011. Defendant may file a reply within 14 days after service of Plaintiff's response. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 2/14/11. (DMT)
February 9, 2011 Filing 286 STRICKEN by(Doc. 287) - RESPONSE to Motion re #282 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jan E Kruska. (ESL) Modified on 2/14/2011 (DMT).
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER that Plaintiff must file a response to Defendants Motion forSummary Judgment, including a document admitting or denying the facts presented inDefendants Statement of Undisputed Facts together with supporting affidavits or otherappropriate exhibits, no later than February 21, 2011.FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant may file a reply within 14 days afterservice of Plaintiffs response. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/20/2011. (see order details)(TCA)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER VACATING the Rule 16 Conference scheduled forTuesday, February 22, 2011 at 1:30 p.m.FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is to Respond to Defendants Motion forSummary Judgment by Friday, February 11, 2011. Defendant may file a Reply by Friday,February 25, 2011. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/12/2011. (TCA)
January 4, 2011 Filing 283 STATEMENT of Material Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgement by Defendant Christopher Brocious. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement of Facts)(Ford, Steven)
January 4, 2011 Filing 282 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Christopher Brocious. (Ford, Steven)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Scheduling Conference set for 2/22/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Stephen M McNamee.. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/3/2011. (see order for details)(TCA)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #269 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended complaint. Claims III,V, VI,VII,VIII are dismissed with prejudice. denying #274 Motion for Summary Judgment.( See order for details).. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 11/17/2010.(TCA)
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER that Plaintiff's #276 Motion to Defer Ruling as to Defendant Brocious' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is granted in part. The motion is granted to the extent that the Court will wait until briefing is complete on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment before issuing a ruling. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/21/10. (ESL)
October 14, 2010 Filing 278 RESPONSE to Motion re #274 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Christopher Brocious. (Ford, Steven)
October 11, 2010 Filing 277 RESPONSE to Motion re #276 MOTION to Defer Ruling as to Dft Brocious' Motion re #269 MOTION to Dismiss Party Christopher Brocious filed by Christopher Brocious. (Ford, Steven)
September 23, 2010 Filing 276 MOTION to Defer Ruling as to Dft Brocious' Motion re #269 MOTION to Dismiss Party Christopher Brocious by Jan E Kruska. (KMG)
September 20, 2010 Filing 275 REPLY to Response to Motion re #269 MOTION to Dismiss Party Christopher Brocious filed by Christopher Brocious. (Ford, Steven)
September 10, 2010 Filing 274 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment as a matter of law as to defendant Christopher Brocious by Jan E Kruska. (same pdf as document #273) (DMT)
September 10, 2010 Filing 273 RESPONSE to Motion re #269 MOTION to Dismiss Party Christopher Brocious filed by Jan E Kruska. (DMT)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER granting #270 Motion to Continue Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference. FURTHER ORDERED VACATING the Rule 16 Preliminary PretrialConference scheduled for Monday, September 13, 2010 at 3 p.m.. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/8/2010.(TCA)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER denying #268 Motion for Sanctions in Accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(f).. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/3/2010.(TCA)
September 2, 2010 Filing 270 MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Christopher Brocious. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ford, Steven)
September 2, 2010 Filing 269 MOTION to Dismiss Party Christopher Brocious by Christopher Brocious. (Ford, Steven)
August 27, 2010 Filing 268 MOTION for Sanctions in accordance with F.R.C.P. Rule 16(f) as to defendant and counsel S. Ford by Jan E Kruska. (DMT)
August 27, 2010 Filing 267 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Jan E Kruska. (DMT)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER granting #263 Motion to excuse personal appearance of Defendant Christopher Brocious on 9/13/2010 Pretrial conference.. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 8/26/2010.(TCA)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs Motion for Clarification to theextent discussed herein (Doc. 261).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court send a copy of Doc. 259, theCourts Order granting Defendants Perverted Justice and Xavier Von Ercks motion forsummary judgment, to Plaintiff at her address of record.. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 8/26/2010.(TCA)
August 25, 2010 Filing 264 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Christopher Brocious. (Ford, Steven)
August 24, 2010 Filing 263 MOTION to Excuse Personal Appearance at Scheduling Conference, Or, Alternatively, to Appear Telephonically At Scheduling Conference by Christopher Brocious. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ford, Steven)
August 18, 2010 Filing 262 Request for Judicial Notice by Jan E Kruska. (DMT)
August 18, 2010 Filing 261 MOTION for Clarification re #260 Order, by Jan E Kruska. (DMT)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Scheduling Conference set for 9/13/2010 03:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Stephen M McNamee.. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 8/9/2010. (see order for details)(TCA)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER that Defendants Motion for Summary Judgmentagainst Plaintiffs copyright infringement claim is GRANTED. (Doc. 254, Mot. for Summ.J.)IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Perverted Justice FoundationIncorporated and Xavier Von Erck are dismissed from the suit.. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 8/9/2010.(TCA)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 258 Memorandum of Decision and ORDER denying #251 Motion to Dismiss Party(see order for details). Scheduling Conference set for 9/13/2010 at 3:00 p.m.. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 8/9/2010.(TCA)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER that Plaintiff shall file a Response to DefendantsMotion to Dismiss, or in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 254) byFriday, August 6, 2010.FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants may file a reply within 15 days afterservice of Plaintiffs response. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 7/6/2010. (TCA)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting #255 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 2, 2010 Filing 255 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Georgia Skoumbis on behalf of Xavier Von Erck, and Perverted Justice Foundation Incorporated.Org. (BAS)
June 2, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX097502 as to Georgia Skoumbis. (BAS)
June 1, 2010 Filing 254 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Copyright Infringement or In The Alternative Motion for Summary Judgment by Xavier Von Erck, Perverted Justice Foundation Incorporated.Org. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Separate Statement)(Umhofer, Matthew)
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER that Plaintiff shall file a Response to DefendantsMotion to Dismiss (Doc. 251) by Friday, June 11, 2010.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant may file a reply within 15 days afterservice of Plaintiffs response. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 5/21/2010. (TCA)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER denying #246 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Copyright Infringement Claim and denying #245 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 5/6/10.(LSP)
April 16, 2010 Filing 251 MOTION to Dismiss Party Christopher Brocious by Christopher Brocious. (Ford, Steven)
March 19, 2010 Filing 250 REQUEST for Judicial Notice by Plaintiff Jan E Kruska. (SAT)
March 12, 2010 Filing 249 SUPPLEMENT re #246 Perverted Justice Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Xavier Von Erck, Perverted Justice Foundation Incorporated.Org. (Umhofer, Matthew) Modified on 3/15/2010, INCORRECT EVENT TYPE SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM "Motion" TO "Supplement", (LSP).
March 8, 2010 Filing 248 RESPONSE in Opposition re #245 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Xavier Von Erck, Perverted Justice Foundation Incorporated.Org. (Umhofer, Matthew)
February 26, 2010 Filing 247 Notice re Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Copyright Infringement Claim by Xavier Von Erck, Perverted Justice Foundation Incorporated.Org re #246 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Copyright Infringement (Umhofer, Matthew)
February 26, 2010 Filing 246 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Copyright Infringement by Xavier Von Erck, Perverted Justice Foundation Incorporated.Org. (Umhofer, Matthew)
February 4, 2010 Filing 245 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to defendants Perverted Justice Foundation Inc. and Xavier Von Erck by Jan E Kruska. (DMT)
February 2, 2010 Filing 244 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by Jan E Kruska for proceedings held on 1/11/2010 before Judge Stephen M McNamee. (BAS)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER that the parties may submit any summary judgmentmotions regarding the issue of Plaintiffs lack of copyright registration and what legal effectthis has on Plaintiffs claims by February 26, 2010.. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/25/2010. (TCA)
January 22, 2010 Filing 242 STATUS REPORT Re Copyright Infringement Claim by Perverted Justice Foundation Incorporated.Org. (Umhofer, Matthew)
January 20, 2010 Filing 241 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT #240 . (ECA)
January 20, 2010 Filing 240 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Scheduling Conference held on 01/11/10 before Judge Stephen M. McNamee. Court Reporter: Elizabeth Cady. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/10/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/22/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/20/2010. (ECA)
January 14, 2010 Filing 239 Remark: Documents mailed by Certified Mail, 7008 1830 0001 7158 9701, Return Receipt, on December 15, 2009 were returned on January 14, 2010 "RETURN TO SENDER UNCLAIMED UNABLE TO FORWARD RETURN TO SENDER" (CAD, )
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting #236 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Defendant April Butler only with prejudice; the present action is dismissed with prejudice as to defendant April Butler only, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees; the status conference set for 2/22/10 is vacated. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/14/10.(REW, )
January 14, 2010 Filing 237 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by Xavier Von Erck for proceedings held on 01/11/10 before Judge Stephen M. McNamee. (ECA)
January 13, 2010 Filing 236 First MOTION to Dismiss Party April Butler by April Butler, David M Butler. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Dismissal With Prejudice of Defendant April Butler Only)(Pywowarczuk, Kristina)
January 11, 2010 Filing 235 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Stephen M McNamee: Apr. Jan Kruska pro per;Matthew Umhofer/Aileen Ocon for dft Perverted Justice and Xavier Von Erck(present)Scheduling conference not held on 1/11/2010. ORDERED denying #172 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying #222 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying #230 Motion to Supplement; denying #230 Motion to Amend/Correct.Court informs plaintiff that attorney Steven Ford for dft Christopher Brocious will be filing a motion to contest process of service. Plaintiff and defendants Perverted Justice and Xavier Von Erck to file by 5:00 p.m. on 1/22/2010 a stipulation to dismiss remaining claims w/o prejudice or a notice that they were unable to reach an agreement. No discovery or motions to be undertaken until after 1/22/2010 as ordered by the Court.(Court Reporter Elizabeth Cady.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA, )
January 11, 2010 Filing 234 NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by James Gary Linder and Donald L Myles, Jr, counsel for Defendant Filmax Inc. (Linder, James)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER re #232 NOTICE of Settlement as to Dft April Butler Only: ORDERED that the parties have until 2/8/10 to file a stipulation for dismissal of this action signed by all parties to the settlement. FURTHER ORDERED in the event no such stipulation is filed, the Court has scheduled a status conference for 2/22/10 at 2:30 p.m. If the stipulation is received by 2/8/10, the status conference will be automatically vacated. FURTHER ORDERED that dft April Butler and her counsel need not attend the Rule 16 Conference scheduled for 1/11/10. (Status Conference set for 2/22/2010 02:30 PM before Judge Stephen M McNamee. See document for full details). Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/8/10. (LAD, )
January 7, 2010 Filing 232 NOTICE of Settlement as to Dft April Butler Only by Jan E Kruska (LAD, )
January 4, 2010 Filing 231 REPORT re: Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Defendant April Butler. (Pywowarczuk, Kristina) Modified on 1/5/2010 (DMT, ). INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM MEMORANDUM, TO REPORT RE RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING.
December 21, 2009 Filing 230 MOTION to Supplement and/or MOTION to Amend Pleadings by Jan E Kruska. (LSP)
December 15, 2009 Filing 229 AFFIDAVIT of Jan E Kruska by Plaintiff Jan E Kruska. (SAT)
December 15, 2009 Filing 228 CERTIFIED RETURN RECEIPT (titled" Notice of Completed Service Upon Defendant Christopher Brocious in Accordance with AZ LRCiv Proc Rule 4.2 and OH LRCiv Proc Rule 4.1(A) and (B)") Returned Executed for service of Summons/Complaint by Jan E Kruska. Christopher Brocious served on 3/18/2008. (SAT)
December 15, 2009 Filing 227 Remark: Summons/Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons/Complaint and Amended Complaint submitted by plaintiff to be sent by Certified Mail by the Clerk of Court. Documents mailed by Certified Mail, 7008 1830 0001 7158 9701, Return Receipt, on December 15, 2009. (CAD, )
December 14, 2009 Filing 226 Judicial Notice/Notice of Errata by Jan E Kruska (SAT)
December 7, 2009 Filing 225 Notice re Defendant April Butler's Notice of Service of Offer of Judgment to Plaintiff by April Butler (Pywowarczuk, Kristina)
December 4, 2009 Filing 224 Minute Order:Scheduling Conference set for 1/11/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Stephen M McNamee. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TCA, )
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER pursuant to #221 Stipulation of Dismissal: this action is dismissed with prejudice against Defendant Filmax Inc. ONLY, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. The status conference set for January 4, 2010 at 1:30p.m. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for January 11, 2009 at 2p.m. will still be held for the remaining Defendants in the case, including Perverted Justice Foundation, Xavier Von Erck, Christopher Brocious, and April Butler. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 12/4/09. (LSP)
December 2, 2009 Filing 221 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Filmax Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Dismissal)(Linder, James)
November 30, 2009 Filing 222 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order #184 filed on August 4, 2009 by Jan E Kruska. (LSP)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER - The Court's 11/13/09 #216 ORDER is amended as follows: Page 2, lines 4-5 "Plaintiff filed her #197 motion for entry of default after Defendants filed their #141 motion to dismiss." is changed to "Plaintiff filed her #197 motion for entry of default after Defendants filed their #147 motion to dismiss". Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 11/19/09. (SAT)
November 18, 2009 Filing 219 Notice of Errata Judicial Notice by Jan E Kruska (SAT)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER re #215 NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Filmax, Inc. Only by Filmax Inc. (Linder, James) filed by Filmax Inc. Status Conference set for 1/4/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Stephen M McNamee. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 11/13/2009. (TCA, )
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER denying #203 Motion Amend Service and Motion for Clarification; denying #209 Motion for Ruling to Recover Service Expenses without prejudice; granting #213 Motion for Ruling; granting #213 Motion for Extension of Time to 1/4/2010 to serve Christopher Brocious pursuant to Rule 4 of FRCivP. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 11/16/2009.(TCA, )
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER denying #197 Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 11/12/2009.(TCA, )
November 13, 2009 Filing 215 NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Filmax, Inc. Only by Filmax Inc. (Linder, James)
November 9, 2009 Filing 214 Notice re Offer of Judgment to Plaintiff by April Butler, Filmax Inc. (Pywowarczuk, Kristina)
October 22, 2009 Filing 213 MOTION for Ruling re Motion to Amend Service and Clarification, and MOTION for Extension of Time to re-serve Amended Complaint by Jan E Kruska. (LSP)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER granting #208 Ex Parte Motion to Continue. ORDERED Rule 16 Pretrial Conference reset for 1/11/2010 02:00 PM before Judge Stephen M McNamee. FURTHER ORDERED Vacating the Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for 11/19/09 FURTHER ORDERED that all other provisions of the Courts 10/2/09 Order Setting Rule 16 Conference #202 remain in effect. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/19/09. (MAP)
October 16, 2009 Filing 211 Notice re Completed Service as to Defendant Chirstopher Brocious by Jan E Kruska (ESL)
October 16, 2009 Filing 210 AFFIDAVIT of Jan E. Kruska by Plaintiff Jan E Kruska. (ESL)
October 16, 2009 Filing 209 MOTION to Recover Service Expenses by Jan E Kruska. (ESL, )
October 14, 2009 Filing 208 EX PARTE MOTION for Order Continuing the Preliminary PreTrial Conference; Memorandum of Points and Authorities by Defendants Xavier Von Erck, Perverted Justice Foundation Incorporated.Org. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Matthew D. Umhofer in Support of Ex Parte Application for Order Continuing the Preliminary PreTrial Conference, #2 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order re Perverted Justice Foundation, Inc.'s and Xavier Von Erck's Ex Parte Application for Continuance of The Preliminary Pretrial Conference)(Umhofer, Matthew) MODIFIED ON 10/20/09 TO CHANGE DOCKET TEXT FROM EX PARTE DOCUMENT TO EX PARTE MOTION (MAP).
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER Striking Plaintiff's #205 Ex Parte Objection to Proposed Stipulation as moot. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/13/09. (MAP)
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER denying without prejudice with leave to re-file #187 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/13/09.(TLJ)
October 8, 2009 Filing 205 ***STRIKING DOCUMENT #205 PURSUANT TO ORDER #207, FILED 10/14/09***EX PARTE Objection to Proposed Stipulation by Plaintiff Jan E Kruska. (MAP) Modified 10/14/2009 (MAP).
October 5, 2009 Filing 204 AFFIDAVIT and Statement of Facts in Support re #203 MOTION to Amend Service as to Defendant Christopher Brocious and MOTION for Clarification filed by Jan E Kruska. (REW, )
October 5, 2009 Filing 203 MOTION to Amend Service as to Defendant Christopher Brocious and MOTION for Clarification by Jan E Kruska. (REW, )
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2009 03:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Stephen M McNamee.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court send copies of this Order to all counsel of record and to all parties, if any, appearing in propria persona.. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/2/2009. (TCA, )
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER that Defendant Brocious Motion to Dismiss AmendedComplaint is DENIED. (Dkt. 141).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Brocious Motion to DismissAmended Complaint is DENIED as to lack of personal jurisdiction.FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Brocious Motion to DismissAmended Complaint is DENIED as to improper venue.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Brocious Motion to DismissAmended Complaint is DENIED as to failure to timely serve process.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Kruska shall have until November 6, 2009 inwhich to serve Christopher Brocious. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/22/2009.(TCA, )
September 15, 2009 Filing 200 REPLY to Response to Motion re #187 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jan E Kruska. (DMT, )
September 11, 2009 Filing 199 RESPONSE in Opposition re #197 MOTION for Entry of Default, #187 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Xavier Von Erck, Perverted Justice Foundation Incorporated.Org. (Umhofer, Matthew)
September 3, 2009 Filing 198 AFFIDAVIT of Plaintiff Jan E Kruska in Support of #197 Application (Motion)for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Jan E Kruska. (SAT)
September 3, 2009 Filing 197 MOTION for Entry of Default and Default Judgment (titled "Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default Judgment...") for Entry of Default by Pla Jan E Kruska against Dfts Perverted Justice Foundation, Inc. and Xavier Von Erck. (SAT) Modified on 9/4/2009, THE ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM "Application" TO "Motion", (LSP).
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting #195 Stipulation :, Attorney Donald L Myles, Jr,James Gary Linder for Filmax Inc. added. Attorney Robert Christian Billar terminated.. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/1/2009. (TCA, )
September 1, 2009 Filing 195 STIPULATION for Substitution of Counsel by Filmax Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Linder, James)
August 28, 2009 Filing 194 Defendants Perverted Justice Foundation, Inc.'s and Xavier Von Erck's ANSWER to #142 Amended Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by Xavier Von Erck, Perverted Justice Foundation Incorporated.Org.(Umhofer, Matthew)
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER denying #191 Motion for ruling on motion to dismiss; denying #192 Motion for interlocutory review and judicial notice.. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 8/12/2009.(TCA, )
August 11, 2009 Filing 192 MOTION for Reconsideration (entitled "Motion for Interlocutory Review and Judicial Notice") re Court's Orders #184 and #188 by Jan E Kruska. (KMG)
August 10, 2009 Filing 191 MOTION for Ruling re Motion to Dismiss as to dft Christopher Brocious by Jan E Kruska. (KMG, )
August 10, 2009 Filing 190 SUPPLEMENTAL Brief to be Incorporated into the Motion #186 to Alter/Amend Judgment by Plaintiff Jan E Kruska. (KMG)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER denying #186 Motion to Amend/Correct Judgment in accordance with F.R.C.P. Rule 59(a)(2) and (e).. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 8/10/2009.(TCA, )
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER granting #176 Motion for Clarification;Count VI of Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed with prejudice against Defendant April Butler.. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 8/10/2009.(TCA, )
August 7, 2009 Filing 187 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Count VII Copyright Infringement Against Dfts Perverted Justice Foundation Inc., and Xavier Von Erck by Jan E Kruska. (KMG)
August 5, 2009 Filing 186 MOTION to alter/amend judgment by Jan E Kruska. (DMT, )
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER that the Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel (Doc. 182) isDENIED without prejudice with leave to refile.. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 8/5/2009. (TCA, )
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER that Specially Appearing Defendants Perverted JusticeFoundation, Inc.s and Xavier Von Ercks Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint isGRANTED in part and DENIED in part. (Dkt. 147).Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaintis DENIED as to lack of personal jurisdiction.Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaintis GRANTED as to Kruskas claims for Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress,Defamation, Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations, Cyberstalking, and PrimaFacie Tort.Claims III (intentional infliction of emotionaldistress), IV (defamation), V (RICO), VI (cyberstalking), and VIII (prima facie tort) ofKruskas Amended Complaint (Dkt.142) are dismissed with prejudice.Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaintis DENIED as to Kruskas claim for copyright infringement (Claim VII).Specially Appearing Defendants PervertedJustice Foundation, Inc. and Xavier Von Erck are ordered to file an Answer or otherwiserespond to this order by August 28, 2009.. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 8/3/2009.(TCA, )
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER vacating #170 Motion for Sanctions; granting #177 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 8/3/2009.(TCA, )
August 4, 2009 Filing 182 STIPULATION for Substitution of Counsel by Filmax Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Linder, James)
July 30, 2009 Filing 181 RESPONSE to Motion re #172 Non-Objection to Amended Complaint by April Butler (Pywowarczuk, Kristina) Modified on 7/31/2009 (TLJ). INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM NOTICE TO RESPONSE.
July 29, 2009 Filing 179 Notice re Non-Party At Fault by April Butler (Pywowarczuk, Kristina)
July 28, 2009 Filing 180 RESPONSE to #176 MOTION for Clarification filed by Jan E Kruska. (LAD)
July 27, 2009 Filing 178 NOTICE OF ERRATA re #170 MOTION for Sanctions against April Butler by Plaintiff Jan E Kruska. (Same PDF as document #177 ) (LAD)
July 27, 2009 Filing 177 MOTION to Withdraw re Motion for Sanctions #170 by Jan E Kruska. (LAD)
July 21, 2009 Filing 176 First MOTION for Clarification of the Court's June 11, 2009 Order by April Butler. (Pywowarczuk, Kristina) Modified on 7/22/2009 (TLJ). DOCKET TEXT MODIFIED TO REFLECT MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION INSTEAD OF MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT. DOCUMENT NOT IN COMPLIANCE WITH LRCIV 7.1(c). ATTORNEY NOTICED.
July 20, 2009 Filing 175 RESPONSE in Opposition re #170 MOTION for Sanctions against April Butler under violations of F.R.C.P. Rule 11 (B)(C) filed by April Butler. (Pywowarczuk, Kristina) Modified on 7/21/2009 (TLJ). DOCUMENT NOT IN COMPLIANCE WITH LRCIV 7.1(c). ATTORNEY NOTICED.
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER denying #171 Judicial Notice/Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 7/18/09. (MAP)
July 16, 2009 Filing 173 JUDICIAL NOTICE/Notice re Initial Disclosure by Jan E Kruska. (LSP)
July 16, 2009 Filing 172 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Jan E Kruska. (LSP)
July 16, 2009 Filing 171 JUDICIAL NOTICE/MOTION to Compel compliance with Court's Order by Jan E Kruska. (LSP)
July 6, 2009 Filing 170 MOTION for Sanctions under violations of F.R.C.P. Rule 11(B)(C) against April Butler by Jan E Kruska. (DMT, )
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER denying #166 Motion for Ruling; denying #168 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 6/30/2009.(TCA, )
June 29, 2009 Filing 168 NOTICE OF ERRATA and MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss, by Jan E Kruska. (ESL)
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER denying #164 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 6/18/2009.(TCA, )
June 18, 2009 Filing 166 MOTION for Ruling re Motion to Dismiss (Docket item 147) Specially Appearing Defendants Perverted Justice Foundation, Inc.'s and Xavier Von Erck's Request for Entry of Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint by Perverted Justice Foundation Incorporated.Org, Xavier Von Erck. (Umhofer, Matthew)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER denying w/o prejudice with leave to refile #118 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 6/11/2009.(TCA, )
June 8, 2009 Filing 164 MOTION to Strike inferences and statements made by the Judge, MOTION to suppress and Judicial Notice by Jan E Kruska. (DMT, )
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting #162 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 2, 2009 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX084863 as to Matthew Umhofer. (BAS, )
June 1, 2009 Filing 162 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Matthew Umhofer on behalf of Perverted Justice Foundation Incorporated.Org. (BAS, )
May 21, 2009 Filing 161 MANDATE of 9th Circuit (Certified Copy) - The judgment of this Court, entered 4/29/09, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. This appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction re case number 09-15426, as to #153 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory filed by Jan E Kruska (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 nda)(SAT)
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff has until Friday, May 29, 2009 to file a Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss.. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 4/29/2009. (TCA, )
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER denying #129 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 4/28/2009.(TCA, )
March 6, 2009 Filing 158 Ninth Circuit Case Number 09-15426 for #153 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory. (LSP)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER denying #154 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis re #153 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory and denying #154 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 3/4/09. (cc: 9CCA). (LSP)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER DENYING Pla's Motion #151 for Recusal of the Honorable Stephen M. McNamee. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 3/4/09.(KMG, )
March 3, 2009 Filing 155 APPEAL PROCESSED to Ninth Circuit re: #153 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory filed by Jan E Kruska. Filed dates for: Notice of Appeal *3/2/2009*, *Complaint* *1/10/2008*, Appealed Order *2/2/09***. Court Reporter *NONE* Fee Status: *IFPPending*. Hearing Dates of *NONE************* *(Pro Se)***. Appellee Attorney: *Steven Gerald Ford* *(Retained)* *sford@alvarez-gilbert.com***. Copies sent to all parties and 9th Circuit. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Record) (LSP)
March 3, 2009 CADS Sent re #153 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory : Civil Appeals Docketing Statement sent to 9th Circuit on this date. (LSP)
March 2, 2009 Filing 154 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis re #153 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory, and MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jan E Kruska. (LSP)
March 2, 2009 Filing 153 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL to 9th Circuit as to #148 Order on Motion to Dismiss Party, by Jan E Kruska. (LSP)
February 26, 2009 Filing 152 RESPONSE in Opposition re #151 MOTION to Reassign Case Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Recusal of Judge McNamee filed by April Butler, David M Butler. (Pywowarczuk, Kristina)
February 9, 2009 Filing 151 MOTION for Recusal of the Honorable Judge Stephen M. McNamee by Jan E Kruska. (LAD)
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting Butler's #64 Second Motion to Dismiss, DISMISSING without prejudice Count III (intentional infliction of emotional distress), Count IV (defamation), Count V (RICO), Count VI (DMCA violations), Count VII (common law negligence), DISMISSING with prejudice Count VI (cyberharassment), all against Defendant David Butler; denying as moot Butler's #81 First Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying Plaitnfif's #90 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 2/5/09.(REW, )
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #107 Motion to Recover Expenses. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 2/4/09.(REW, )
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting Defendant Barbara Ochoa's #88 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 4(m) and 12(b)(2), (3), and (5); all claims against Defendant Barbara Ochoa are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 2/2/09.(REW, )
January 26, 2009 Filing 147 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction SPECIAL APPEARING DEFENDANTS PERVERTED JUSTICE FOUNDATION, INC.'S AND XAVIER VON ERCK'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT, MOTION to Dismiss Case by Perverted Justice Foundation Incorporated.Org, Xavier Von Erck. (Mumford, Marcus)
January 20, 2009 Filing 146 REPLY in Support re #141 MOTION to Dismiss Party Christopher Brocious Pursuant to Rules 4(m) and 12(b)(2), (3), and (5) filed by Christopher Brocious. (Ford, Steven)
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER denying pla's #104 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Pla is reminded that she is the party who initiated the lawsuit, and this, she must bear the cost of filing and defending motions. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/16/2009. (LAD)
January 12, 2009 Filing 144 RESPONSE to #141 MOTION to Dismiss Party Christopher Brocious Pursuant to Rules 4(m) and 12(b)(2), (3), and (5) filed by Jan E Kruska. (LAD)
January 7, 2009 Filing 143 AFFIDAVIT of Jan E Kruska re #142 Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff Jan E Kruska. (REW, )
January 7, 2009 Filing 142 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Perverted Justice Foundation Incorporated.Org, Xavier Von Erck, Barabara W Ochoa, Filmax Inc., April Butler, David M Butler, Jane Does, John Does, Limited Liability Companies, Black and White Partnerships, Christopher Brocious; Jury Demand, filed by Jan E Kruska.(REW, )
January 2, 2009 Filing 141 MOTION to Dismiss Party Christopher Brocious Pursuant to Rules 4(m) and 12(b)(2), (3), and (5) by Christopher Brocious. (Ford, Steven)
December 16, 2008 Filing 140 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Christopher Brocious, Barabara W Ochoa, Filmax Inc., April Butler, David M Butler, Jane Does, John Does, Limited Liability Companies, Black and White Partnerships; Jury Demand, filed by Jan E Kruska. NOTE: Defendants Xavier Von Erck and Perverted Justice Foundation Incorporated.com were terminated by #139 Memorandum of Decision and Order filed 12/16/08.(LSP)
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER granting #44 Defendants Perverted Justice Foundation, Inc's and Xavier Von Erck's Motion to Dismiss Case; claims agianst these defendants are dismissed without prejudice with leave to re-file. Plaintiff has until 1/9/09 to re-file her claims against these defendants. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying #60 Plaintiff's Motion for Hearing on Motion. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 12/15/08.(LSP)
November 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting #68 Cross-Motion to Dismiss Party pursuant to Rules 4(m) and 12 (b)(2), (3) and (5)without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that the claims against Defendant Brocious are dismissed without prejudice with leave to re-file. FURTHER ORDERED that Pla has until 12/19/08 to re-file her claims against Dft Brocious. Party Christopher Brocious terminated. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 11/25/08.(DNH)
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED GRANTING Defendant Barbara Ochoa's #96 Motionto Strike Doc. 95. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 11/15/08.(SAT)
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED DENYING Pla's #83 Corrected Motion for Default Judgment in Accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 55 and L.R. Civ. P. 4(f), 4.2, C and L.R.4.2, 5(M) as to Defendant Christopher Brocious and Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 11/15/08.(SAT)
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED DENYING Pla's #74 Judicial Notice, Special Motion, Motion for Judgment in Full for Plaintiff on the Pleadings as to Defendants David Butler and Filmax, Inc.. FURTHER ORDERED GRANTING #77 Motion to Withdraw Judicial Notice, Special Motion, Motion for Judgment (In Reference to Doc. 74 Only) Against Defendants David Butler and Filmax, Inc.. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 11/15/08. (SAT)
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED DENYING Pla's #73 Motion and Affidavit withExhibits to Quash Replies, Memorandums, etc., Motion for Judgment in Full, and Motion to Recover Services Expenses. FURTHER ORDERED GRANTING #87 Motion to Withdraw Judicial Notice, Special Motion, Motion for Judgment (In Reference to Doc. 73 Only). Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 11/15/08.(SAT)
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED DENYING Pla's #69 Expedited Motion for Request for Reconsideration of the Courts Order Dated June 16, 2008, and Affidavit of Plaintiff in Support. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 11/15/08.(SAT)
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED DENYING Pla's #58 Motion for Reconsideration of the Courts Order Dated May 14, 2008. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 11/15/08.(SAT)
October 30, 2008 Filing 131 RESPONSE to Motion re #129 MOTION to Strike Defendants April and David's Butler's Reply in Support of Summary Judgment and Defendants Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts filed by April Butler, David M Butler. (Campbell, Daniel)
October 21, 2008 Filing 130 AFFIDAVIT of Jan E. Kruska by Plaintiff Jan E Kruska. (SAT) Modified on 10/23/2008 (SAT). FILE DATE MODIFIED TO CORRECT FILE DATE FROM 10/23/08 TO 10/21/08.
October 21, 2008 Filing 129 Request for Judicial Notice/MOTION to Strike Defendants April and David Butler's Reply in Support of Summary Judgment (Doc. 127) AND Defendants Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts (Doc. 128) by Jan E Kruska. (SAT)
October 16, 2008 Filing 128 Reply re #124 Statement /Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Controverting Statement of Facts and Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Separate Statement of Facts by Defendants April Butler, David M Butler. (Campbell, Daniel)
October 16, 2008 Filing 127 REPLY in Support re #118 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by April Butler, David M Butler. (Campbell, Daniel)
October 16, 2008 Filing 126 Notice re of Affiliation of Counsel by April Butler, David M Butler (Pywowarczuk, Kristina)
September 26, 2008 Filing 125 AFFIDAVIT of Jan E. Kruska re #123 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment, by Plaintiff Jan E Kruska. (ESL, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/26/2015: #1 Document rescanned for better image) (CLB).
September 26, 2008 Filing 124 STATEMENT of Facts in Support of #123 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment, by Plaintiff Jan E Kruska. (ESL, )
September 26, 2008 Filing 123 RESPONSE to Motion re #118 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Jan E Kruska. (ESL, )
September 26, 2008 Filing 122 RESPONSE to Motion re #107 MOTION for to Recover Expenses, #104 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by April Butler, David M Butler. (Campbell, Daniel)
September 19, 2008 Filing 121 AFFIDAVIT of April Butler re #119 Statement by Defendants April Butler, David M Butler. (Campbell, Daniel)
September 19, 2008 Filing 120 AFFIDAVIT of David M. Butler re #119 Statement by Defendants April Butler, David M Butler. (Campbell, Daniel)
September 19, 2008 Filing 119 STATEMENT of Separate Statement of Facts re #118 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants April Butler, David M Butler. (Campbell, Daniel)
September 19, 2008 Filing 118 MOTION for Summary Judgment by April Butler, David M Butler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Campbell, Daniel)
September 19, 2008 Filing 117 WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re #101 Affidavit, #100 Affidavit, #99 Statement by Defendants April Butler, David M Butler. (Campbell, Daniel)
September 19, 2008 Filing 116 WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re #98 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants April Butler, David M Butler. (Campbell, Daniel)
September 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting Dfts' #112 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Robert Christian Billar of the firm Billar and Donald is hereby WITHDRAWN as counsel, and J. Daniel Campbell and Daniel Mayer of the law firm of O'Connor and Campbell are substituted as counsel of record. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 09/17/08. (ESL)
September 16, 2008 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Campbell, III on behalf of April Butler (Campbell, Daniel)
September 16, 2008 Filing 113 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS Proposed Order re: #112 MOTION to Substitute Attorney: for substitution of J. Daniel Campbell and Daniel Mayer in place of Robert Christian Billar. Filed by David M Butler. (Campbell, Daniel) Modified on 9/17/2008, INCORRECT EVENT TYPE SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM "Lodged Proposed" TO "Additional Attachments", (LSP).
September 16, 2008 Filing 112 MOTION to Substitute Attorney: for substitution of J. Daniel Campbell and Daniel Mayer in place of Robert Christian Billar by David M Butler. (Campbell, Daniel) Modified on 9/17/2008, DOCUMENT NOT IN COMPLIANCE WITH LRCiv 7.1(c). ATTORNEY NOTICED, (LSP).
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER denying without prejudice the #97 Motion for Substitution of Counsel. DFts David M. Butler and April Bustler shall include all requisite information in their motion, pursuant to LRCiv 83.3(b); denying Pla Ms. Kruska's #103 Motion for Recovery of Attorney Fees; denying Pla Ms. Kruska's #105 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 09/15/08. (ESL)
September 12, 2008 Filing 110 ADDITITIONAL ATTACHMENTS: LODGED Proposed Order of Substitution re: #97 MOTION to Substitute Attorney: Filed by April Butler, David M Butler. (Campbell, Daniel) Modified on 9/15/2008, INCORRECT EVENT TYPE SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM "Lodged Proposed Document" TO "Additional Attachments", (LSP).
September 12, 2008 Filing 109 Notice re Notice of Errata by April Butler, David M Butler re #97 MOTION to Substitute Attorney: (Campbell, Daniel)
September 11, 2008 Filing 108 STATEMENT of Facts re #106 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Jan E Kruska. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit)(LSP)
September 11, 2008 Filing 107 MOTION to Recover Expenses by Jan E Kruska. NOTE: Filed as one document with #106 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment. (LSP)
September 11, 2008 Filing 106 RESPONSE to Motion re #98 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jan E Kruska. NOTE: Filed as one document with "Motion to Recover Expenses". (LSP)
September 11, 2008 Filing 105 MOTION for Sanctions against "J Daniel Campbell, Esq., Daniel Mayer of the Law Firm O'Connor and Campbell P.C." by Jan E Kruska. (LSP)
September 11, 2008 Filing 104 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Jan E Kruska. Styled as: "Motion to Recover Expenses against April Butler pursuant to FedRCivP 5 and 11(B). (LSP)
September 11, 2008 Filing 103 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Jan E Kruska. Styled as: "Motion to Recover Expenses against David M Butler Pursuant to FedRCivP 5 and 11(B)". (LSP)
September 11, 2008 Filing 102 AFFIDAVIT of Jan E Kruska re #98 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #97 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Plaintiff Jan E Kruska. (LSP)
September 3, 2008 Filing 101 AFFIDAVIT of April Butler re #99 Statement of Facts by Defendants April Butler, David M Butler. (Campbell, Daniel)
September 3, 2008 Filing 100 AFFIDAVIT of David M. Butler re #99 Statement of Facts by Defendants April Butler, David M Butler. (Campbell, Daniel)
September 3, 2008 Filing 99 STATEMENT of Statement of Facts re #98 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants April Butler, David M Butler. (Campbell, Daniel)
September 3, 2008 Filing 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment by April Butler, David M Butler. (Campbell, Daniel)
August 15, 2008 Filing 97 MOTION to Substitute Attorney for April Butler and David M Butler (Campbell, Daniel) Modified on 8/18/2008 (SAT). INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED, THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM "NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION" TO "MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY".
August 7, 2008 Filing 96 MOTION to Strike re Doc. 95 by Barabara W Ochoa. (Ford, Steven)
August 5, 2008 Filing 95 STRICKEN PER ORDER #137 DATED 11/17/08 - RESPONSE to Defendant Barbara Ochoa's Reply re #93 Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint (MAP) Modified on 11/17/2008 (SAT).
July 30, 2008 Filing 94 REPLY to Response to Motion re #83 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Christopher Brocious MOTION to Strike re strike any and all filings on behalf of Christopher Brocious and renewed request for sanctions (Motion for Sanctions filed at docket #90) filed by Jan E Kruska. (TLJ)
July 28, 2008 Filing 93 REPLY in Support re #88 MOTION to Dismiss Party Barbara Ochoa Pursuant to Rules 4(m) and 12(b)(2), (3), and (5) filed by Barabara W Ochoa. (Ford, Steven)
July 24, 2008 Filing 92 RESPONSE in Opposition re #83 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Christopher Brocious MOTION to Strike re strike any and all filings on behalf of Christopher Brocious filed by Christopher Brocious. (Ford, Steven)
July 17, 2008 Filing 91 RESPONSE to Motion re #88 MOTION to Dismiss Party Barbara Ochoa Pursuant to Rules 4(m) and 12(b)(2), (3), and (5) filed by Jan E Kruska. (TLJ)
July 14, 2008 Filing 90 MOTION for Sanctions by Jan E Kruska. (same pdf as document #89) (TLJ)
July 14, 2008 Filing 89 RESPONSE to Motion re #81 First MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Jan E Kruska. (TLJ)
July 13, 2008 Filing 88 MOTION to Dismiss Party Barbara Ochoa Pursuant to Rules 4(m) and 12(b)(2), (3), and (5) by Barabara W Ochoa. (Ford, Steven)
July 9, 2008 Filing 87 MOTION to Withdraw Judicial Notice, Special Motion, MOTION for Judgment (in reference to Doc. 73 only) against Defendant Barbara Ochoa only by Jan E Kruska. (TLJ)
July 9, 2008 Filing 86 RESPONSE to Motion re #68 MOTION to Dismiss Party Christopher Brocious filed by Jan E Kruska. (same pdf as document #85) (TLJ)
July 9, 2008 Filing 85 REPLY to Response to Motion re #73 MOTION to Quash Replies, Memorandums, etc. MOTION for Judgment Judgment in Full MOTION for to Recover Service Expenses filed by Jan E Kruska. (TLJ)
July 9, 2008 Filing 84 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #83 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Christopher Brocious. (TLJ)
July 9, 2008 Filing 83 AMENDED MOTION for Default Judgment as to Christopher Brocious with Affidavits and Memorandums in Support, MOTION to Strike any and all filings on behalf of Christopher Brocious by Jan E Kruska. (TLJ)
July 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #18 Defendants Parsons and GoDaddy's Motion to Dismiss. ORDER dismissing without prejudice all claims against Defendant Parsons. ORDER dismissing without prejudice Count VI (DMCA) violations) against Defendant GoDaddy. ORDER dismissing without prejudice Count V (RICO violations) against Defendant GoDaddy. ORDER dismissing with prejudice Count III (intentional infliction of emotional distress) against Defendant GoDaddy. ORDER dismissing with prejudice Count IV (defamation) against Defendant GoDaddy. ORDER dismissing with prejudice Count VI (cyberharassment) against Defendant GoDaddy. ORDER dismissing with prejudice Count VII (common law negligence) against Defendant GoDaddy. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 7/8/08.(TLJ)
July 8, 2008 Filing 81 First MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction by David M Butler. (Billar, Robert) Modified on 7/9/2008, DOCUMENT NOT IN COMPLIANCE WITH LRCiv 7.1(c). ATTORNEY NOTICED, (LSP).
July 2, 2008 Filing 80 RESPONSE in Opposition re #73 MOTION to Quash Replies, Memorandums, etc. MOTION for Judgment Judgment in Full MOTION for to Recover Service Expenses filed by Barabara W Ochoa. (Ford, Steven)
July 2, 2008 Filing 79 RESPONSE in Opposition re #73 MOTION to Quash Replies, Memorandums, etc. MOTION for Judgment Judgment in Full MOTION for to Recover Service Expenses filed by Christopher Brocious. (Ford, Steven)
July 2, 2008 Filing 78 REPLY in Support re #68 MOTION to Dismiss Party Christopher Brocious filed by Christopher Brocious. (Ford, Steven)
June 30, 2008 Filing 77 MOTION to Withdraw Judicial Notice, MOTION for Judgment against Defendants David Butler and Filmax, Inc. by Jan E Kruska. (TLJ)
June 30, 2008 Filing 76 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Barabara W Ochoa;Jury Demand, filed by Jan E Kruska. (Attachments: #1 exhibits, #2 exhibits, #3 exhibits)(TLJ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2015: #4 More Legible Copy of Exhibits, #5 More Legible Copy of Exhibits, #6 More Legible Copy Attached) (REK).
June 25, 2008 Filing 75 RESPONSE in Opposition re #74 MOTION for Judgment on Pleadings filed by Filmax Inc., David M Butler. (Billar, Robert) Modified on 6/26/2008, DOCUMENT NOT IN COMPLIANCE WITH LRCiv 7.1(C). ATTORNEY NOTICED, (LSP).
June 23, 2008 Filing 74 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to defendants David Butler and Filmax, Inc. and Judicial Notice by Jan E Kruska. (TLJ)
June 23, 2008 Filing 73 MOTION and Affidavit with Exhibits to Quash Replies, Memorandums, etc., MOTION for Judgment in Full, MOTION for to Recover Service Expenses by Jan E Kruska. (same pdf as document #71) (TLJ)
June 23, 2008 Filing 72 RESPONSE to Motion re #68 MOTION to Dismiss Party Christopher Brocious filed by Jan E Kruska. (same pdf as document #71) (TLJ)
June 23, 2008 Filing 71 REPLY to Response to Motion re #59 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Christopher Brocious filed by Jan E Kruska. (TLJ)
June 23, 2008 Filing 70 RESPONSE to Motion re #64 Second MOTION to Dismiss Case with Affidavit and Memorandum filed by Jan E Kruska. (TLJ)
June 23, 2008 Filing 69 MOTION for Reconsideration re Court's Order dated 6/16/08 #63 and Affidavit in Support by Jan E Kruska. (TLJ)
June 20, 2008 Filing 68 CROSS MOTION to Dismiss Party Christopher Brocious by Christopher Brocious. NOTE: Filed as one document with #67 Response re #59 Motion for Default Judgment. (LSP)
June 20, 2008 Filing 67 RESPONSE in Opposition re #59 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Christopher Brocious and CROSS-MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 4(m) and 12(b)(2), (3), and (5) filed by Christopher Brocious. (Ford, Steven)
June 20, 2008 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Gerald Ford on behalf of Christopher Brocious (Ford, Steven)
June 20, 2008 Filing 65 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION re OF WITHDRAWAL OF PETER B. MORRISON AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD by Perverted Justice Foundation Incorporated.Org, Xavier Von Erck (Mumford, Marcus) Modified on 6/23/2008, INCORRECT EVENT TYPE SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM "Notice" TO "Notice of Attorney Substitution", (LSP).
June 19, 2008 Filing 64 Second MOTION to Dismiss Case by David M Butler. (Billar, Robert) Modified on 6/24/2008, DOCUMENT NOT IN COMPLIANCE WITH LRCiv 7.1(c). ATTORNEY NOTICED, (LSP).
June 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #17 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. ORDER that the claims against Defendant Ochoa are dismissed without prejudice with leave to re-file. ORDER that Plaintiff has until 7/7/08 to re-file her claims against Defenant Ochoa. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 6/16/08.(TLJ)
June 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying without prejudice with leave to re-file #23 Defendant David Butler's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 6/10/08.(TLJ)
June 9, 2008 Filing 61 Notice of Initial Disclosure by Jan E Kruska. (TLJ)
June 9, 2008 Filing 60 MOTION to Set Hearing for Oral Argument on Motion re Motions to Dismiss by Jan E Kruska. (TLJ)
June 4, 2008 Filing 59 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Christopher Brocious with Memorandum in Support by Jan E Kruska. (TLJ)
May 20, 2008 Filing 58 MOTION for Reconsideration re court's order dated 5/14/08 by Jan E Kruska. (TLJ)
May 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying #32 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and File Waiver of Service; denying #34 Plaintiff's Motion to File Waiver of Service; denying #36 Plaintiff's Motion to File Waiver of Service; denying #37 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying #38 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 5/14/08.(TLJ)
May 15, 2008 Copy of document number 57 mailed to Jan Kruska on this date. (TLJ)
April 30, 2008 Filing 56 RESPONSE re #50 Reply to Response to Motion, by Plaintiff Jan E Kruska. (TLJ)
April 30, 2008 Filing 55 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Perverted Justice Foundation and Xavier Von Erck on 2/6/08 by Jan E Kruska. (TLJ)
April 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER that Defendant MySpace is dismissed from this lawsuit without prejudice re: #48 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 4/29/08. (TLJ)
April 25, 2008 Filing 54 RESPONSE re #50 Reply to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Jan E Kruska. (TLJ)
April 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting #51 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
April 21, 2008 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 100, receipt number PHX070287 as to Aileen Delcarmen Ocon. (BAS, )
April 18, 2008 Filing 51 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Aileen Delcarmen Ocon on behalf of Perverted Justice Foundation Incorporated.Org, and Xavier Von Erck. (BAS, )
April 17, 2008 Filing 50 REPLY to Response to Motion re #44 MOTION to Dismiss Case Specially Appearing Defendants Perverted Justice Foundation's and Xavier Von Erck's Motion to Dismiss filed by Perverted Justice Foundation Incorporated.Org, Xavier Von Erck. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration Of Marcus R. Mumford In Support Of Special Appearing Defendants Perverted Justice Foundation, Inc.'s And Xavier Von Erck's Motion To Dismiss)(Mumford, Marcus)
April 1, 2008 Filing 49 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants Godaddy.com. Inc.'s and Bob Parsons' Motion to Dismiss, and Memorandum in Support Defendants' GoDaddy.com, Inc.';s and Bob Parson's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Clarify Complaint filed by GoDaddy.com, Bob Parsons. (McKirgan, Robert)
March 31, 2008 Filing 48 MOTION to Dismiss Party Myspace, Inc. with Statement of Facts and Memorandum by Jan E Kruska. (TLJ)
March 31, 2008 Filing 47 RESPONSE to Motion and Memorandum re #44 MOTION to Dismiss Case Specially Appearing Defendants Perverted Justice Foundation's and Xavier Von Erck's Motion to Dismiss filed by Jan E Kruska. (TLJ)
March 24, 2008 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM and Affidavit re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Party Barbara Ochoa by Plaintiff Jan E Kruska. (TLJ)
March 21, 2008 Filing 45 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Perverted Justice Foundation Incorporated.Org. (Mumford, Marcus)
March 21, 2008 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss Case Specially Appearing Defendants Perverted Justice Foundation's and Xavier Von Erck's Motion to Dismiss by Perverted Justice Foundation Incorporated.Org, Xavier Von Erck. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Specially Appearing Defendant Xavier Von Erck)(Mumford, Marcus)
March 20, 2008 Filing 43 RESPONSE (corrected) to Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants Godaddy.com. Inc.'s and Bob Parsons' Motion to Dismiss, and Memorandum in Support, Motion to Clarify Complaint filed by Jan E Kruska. (TLJ)
March 19, 2008 Filing 42 REPLY in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Party Barbara Ochoa filed by Barabara W Ochoa. (Ford, Steven)
March 18, 2008 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Gerald Ford on behalf of Barabara W Ochoa (Ford, Steven)
March 17, 2008 Filing 40 REPLY in Support re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants Godaddy.com. Inc.'s and Bob Parsons' Motion to Dismiss, and Memorandum in Support Defendants Godaddy.com, Inc.'s, and Bob Parson's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by GoDaddy.com, Bob Parsons. (McKirgan, Robert)
March 12, 2008 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 First MOTION for Dismissal pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by David M Butler. (Billar, Robert)
March 6, 2008 Filing 38 MOTION to Compel Disclosure Statement for Defendant Filmax, Inc. by Jan E Kruska. (TLJ)
March 6, 2008 Filing 37 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jan E Kruska. (TLJ)
March 6, 2008 Filing 36 MOTION for Request for Defendant to File Waiver os Service by Jan E Kruska. (TLJ)
March 6, 2008 Filing 35 RESPONSE with memorandum to Motion re #23 First MOTION for Dismissal pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Jan E Kruska. (TLJ)
March 6, 2008 Filing 34 MOTION for Defendant to File Waiver of Service by Jan E Kruska. (same pdf as document #33) (TLJ)
March 6, 2008 Filing 33 RESPONSE with Memorandum re #22 Answer to Complaint by Plaintiff Jan E Kruska. (TLJ)
March 6, 2008 Filing 32 MOTION for Defendant to File Waiver os Service, MOTION to Compel Defendant to Serve Copies by Jan E Kruska. (same pdf as document #31) (TLJ)
March 6, 2008 Filing 31 RESPONSE and Memorandum re #20 Answer to Complaint by Plaintiff Jan E Kruska. (TLJ)
March 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting #29 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
March 6, 2008 Filing 29 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Marcus R Mumford on behalf of Perverted Justice Foundation Incorporated.Org, and Xavier Von Erck. (BAS, )
March 6, 2008 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 100, receipt number PHX068699 as to Marcus R Mumford. (BAS, )
February 29, 2008 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond filed by Jan E Kruska. (TLJ)
February 29, 2008 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition with Memorandum re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants Godaddy.com. Inc.'s and Bob Parsons' Motion to Dismiss, and Memorandum in Support filed by Jan E Kruska. (TLJ, )
February 29, 2008 Filing 26 RESPONSE In Opposition to Motion with memorandum re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Party Barbara Ochoa filed by Jan E Kruska. (TLJ)
February 29, 2008 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Christian Billar on behalf of David M Butler (Billar, Robert)
February 29, 2008 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Christian Billar on behalf of Filmax Inc. (Billar, Robert)
February 29, 2008 Filing 23 First MOTION for Dismissal pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by David M Butler. (Billar, Robert) Modified on 3/3/2008 (TLJ). DOCUMENT NOT IN COMPLIANCE WITH LRCIV 7.1(c). ATTORNEY NOTICED.
February 29, 2008 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Filmax Inc..(Billar, Robert) Modified on 3/3/2008 (TLJ). DOCUMENT NOT IN COMPLIANCE WITH LRCIV 7.1(c). ATTORNEY NOTICED.
February 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #14 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiff's complaint no later than 3/21/08. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 2/29/08.(TLJ)
February 27, 2008 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by April Butler.(TLJ)
February 26, 2008 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GoDaddy.com, Bob Parsons. (McKirgan, Robert)
February 26, 2008 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendants Godaddy.com. Inc.'s and Bob Parsons' Motion to Dismiss, and Memorandum in Support by GoDaddy.com, Bob Parsons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McKirgan, Robert)
February 26, 2008 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond To Complaint And To Ascertain Proper Service Corrected Motion For Extension Of Time To Respond To Complaint by Perverted Justice Foundation Incorporated.Org, Xavier Von Erck. (Morrison, Peter)
February 25, 2008 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Party Barbara Ochoa for lack of jurisdiction by Barabara W Ochoa. (TLJ)
February 25, 2008 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jan E Kruska. Xavier Von Erck served on 2/6/2008. (TLJ)
February 25, 2008 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jan E Kruska. Perverted Justice Foundation Incorporated.Org served on 2/6/2008. (TLJ)
February 25, 2008 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Perverted Justice Foundation Incorporated.Org, Xavier Von Erck. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morrison, Peter)
February 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. GoDaddy.com answer due 2/26/2008; Bob Parsons answer due 2/26/2008. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 2/20/08.(TLJ)
February 19, 2008 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by GoDaddy.com, Bob Parsons. (TLJ)
January 29, 2008 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jan E Kruska. Bob Parsons served on 1/28/2008. (DMT, )
January 29, 2008 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jan E Kruska. GoDaddy.com served on 1/28/2008. (DMT, )
January 23, 2008 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Barabara W Ochoa, Filmax Inc., April Butler, David M Butler, GoDaddy.com, Bob Parsons, MySpace.com, Perverted Justice Foundation Incorporated.Org, Xavier Von Erck, Christopher Brocious. (Attachments: #1 Erck Summons, #2 Brocious Summons, #3 Ochoa Summons, #4 Filmax Summons, #5 April Butler, #6 David Butler, #7 GoDaddy, #8 Bob Parsons, #9 MySpace.com)(REK). *** IMPORTANT: You must select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" on the print screen in order for the court seal to appear on the summons you print.
January 18, 2008 Filing 7 Filing fee received: $ 350, receipt number PHX066879 (DMT, )
January 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefore. Plaintiff shall have 10 days from the entry of this Order to pay the filing fee of $350.00. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter dismissal of this action without further notice if Plaintiff fails to timely comply. Denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel.. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/16/08.(DMT, )
January 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standard Civil Track Initial ORDER. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/16/2008. (TCA, )
January 10, 2008 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jan E Kruska. (DMT, )
January 10, 2008 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jan E Kruska. (DMT, )
January 10, 2008 Filing 2 Notice re Magistrate Consent Form (REK)
January 10, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Jan E Kruska.(REK)
January 10, 2008 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Stephen M. McNamee. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 08-54-PHX-SMM. (Entered by REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kruska v. Ochoa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Von Erck
Represented By: Aileen Delcarmen Ocon
Represented By: Marcus R Mumford,
Represented By: Matthew Umhofer
Represented By: Georgia Skoumbis,
Represented By: Peter B Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barabara W Ochoa
Represented By: Steven Gerald Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Filmax Incorporated
Represented By: Donald L Myles, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Christian Billar
Represented By: James Gary Linder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Parsons
Represented By: Robert H McKirgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MySpace.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Brocious
Represented By: Steven Gerald Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petra Luna
Represented By: Steven Gerald Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M Butler
Represented By: Kristina Lynn Pywowarczuk
Represented By: Daniel Louis Mayer
Represented By: Robert Christian Billar
Represented By: Daniel Campbell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perverted Justice Foundation Incorporated.Org
Represented By: Aileen Delcarmen Ocon
Represented By: Marcus R Mumford,
Represented By: Matthew Umhofer
Represented By: Georgia Skoumbis,
Represented By: Peter B Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip John Eide
Represented By: Aileen Delcarmen Ocon
Represented By: Marcus R Mumford,
Represented By: Matthew Umhofer
Represented By: Georgia Skoumbis,
Represented By: Peter B Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoDaddy.com
Represented By: Robert H McKirgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April Butler
Represented By: Kristina Lynn Pywowarczuk
Represented By: Daniel Louis Mayer
Represented By: Daniel Campbell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan E Kruska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?