AZ Holding, LLC v. Frederick et al

Plaintiff: AZ Holding, LLC
Defendant: Thomas C Frederick, Christine J Cobb, RBW Consultants, Inc. and Bumaro LLC
Counter_claimant: Bumaro LLC, Thomas C Frederick, Christine J Cobb and RBW Consultants, Inc.
Counter_defendant: AZ Holding, LLC, Bumaro LLC, Christine J Cobb, Thomas C Frederick and RBW Consultants, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2008cv00276
Filed: February 10, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2013 211 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER as to 210 Emergency MOTION to Quash Defendants' Subpoena Duces Tecum Served Upon Four Customers of Non-Party Ameri-Fab LLC, and For Protective Order: IT IS ORDERED that the production of all documents and other things subpoenaed by Defendants Thomas C. Frederick, Christine J. Cobb, RBW Consultants Incorporated, and Bumaro LLC, served on September 27 and 30, 2013 upon non-parties Mobile Mini, Inc., Pac Van Sales and Leasing, Modspace, and U.S. Modular is hereby STAYED unti l further order of the Court. Counsel for Ameri-Fab must promptly provide a copy of this signed Order to Mobile Mini, Inc., Pac Van Sales and Leasing, Modspace, and U.S. Modular. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for Fredericks, AZ Holding, and A meri-Fab shall promptly confer in an effort to reach a mutually-acceptable resolution and written stipulation to resolve the discovery issues raised in the subject Motion, and, at a minimum, agree in writing on what is and what is not discoverable by Fredericks. Counsel shall jointly file a stipulation, and a separate order consistent with the stipulation, on or before Friday, October 18, 2013, addressing the agreement of the parties and Ameri-Fab. Absent Fredericks, AZ Holding, and non-par ty Ameri-Fab resolving the issues by stipulation, Fredericks shall file their response to Non-Party Ameri-Fab, LLC's Emergency Motion to Quash Subpoenas Served On Its Customers and For Protective Order by Friday, October 25, 2013. Ameri-Fab may file an optional reply by Friday, November 1, 2013. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 10/7/13. (LAD)
November 29, 2010 190 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Portion of the Arbitration Award, Confirm the Remainder, and Award Plaintiff Its Attorneys' Fees and Expenses Incurred in Arbitration and Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Related Non-Taxabl e Expenses, 178 , 179 , are denied; Defendants/Counterclaimants' request to confirm the Final Arbitration Award issued by the Arbitrator on July 19, 2010 is granted; the Final Arbitration Award is hereby confirmed; Defendants shall lodge a proposed Judgment, consistent with this order and the Final Arbitration Award, within 10 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 11/29/10. (REW) Modified on 11/29/2010 (REW).
February 10, 2010 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Defendants' request to compel arbitration, docket #167 at 5 is granted. This action is stayed. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report concerning their arbitration on or before Friday, August 6, 2010 or this case may be dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying without prejudice 140 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 2/9/10.(LSP)
November 25, 2009 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants' Controverting and Supplemental Statement of Facts etc. and Response to Motion of Plaintiff for Partial Summary Judgment, docket numbers 156 , 157 , are STRICKEN without prejudice. Defendants shall refile their Controvert ing and Supplemental Statement of Facts etc. and Response to Motion of Plaintiff for Partial Summary Judgment, on or before Tuesday, December 1, 2009 which shall be substantively identical to its November 23, 2009 filings but it shall comply in all respects with this Order, the Local Rules, and the ECF Manual. Plaintiff's Reply, if any, shall be filed on or before Friday, December 18, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 11/24/09. (see order for full details)(DMT, )
November 19, 2009 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED awarding attys' fees in favor of Pla AZ Holding, L.L.C. in the amount of $5,924.00 and against Dfts, which shall be paid by check made payable to AZ Holding, L.L.C. and delivered to Pla's cnsl on or before Tuesday , 1/19/10. Dfts shall pay the attys' fees sanction in full by Tuesday, 1/19/10, or Pla may seek further sanctions, including dismissal with prejudice of Dfts' counterclaims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 11/19/09. (SAT)
October 13, 2009 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties' Stipulated Joint Motion 142 is granted in part and denied in part as follows: Defendants shall file their objections to Plaintiff's Attorneys' Fees Affidavit on or before 10/15/09. Defendants shall file their Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint on or before 10/15/09. The Stipulated Joint Motion to extend the deadline for Defendants/Counterclaimants to conduct a deposition of third-party witness, Sheila Hunter, is denie d. The Stipulated Joint Motion to extend the deadline for Plaintiff to take the deposition of Defendants' Rebuttal Expert Witness, Linda Decker, is granted. The Rule 16 Scheduling Order's deadline for completing discovery is hereby modified as to Ms. Decker only. Her deposition shall be taken on or before, but no later than, 10/19/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 10/13/09. (TLJ)
September 22, 2009 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 103 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, 104 , shall be deemed filed on the date this order granting leave to amend is docketed by the Clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/21/09.(LSP)
September 3, 2009 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Pla's 102 Motion to Continue the Close of Discovery by Thirty Days is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/3/09. (SAT)
August 10, 2009 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Pla's motion for an order precluding Dfts' use of Linda Decker as an expert witness is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Dfts' expert witness Linda Decker may only testify as a rebuttal expert, i.e., she cannot testify in D fts' case-in-chief if Pla's expert does not testify in Pla's case-in-chief. FURTHER ORDERED pursuant to Rule 37(c)(1)(A), FED.R.CIV.P., awarding to Pla its reasonable attorneys' fees incurred in urging the subject motion. Pla shal l timely file with the Clerk of the Court an Attorney's Fees Affidavit, consistent with LRCiv 54.2(d)(4) and (e), by Friday, September 18, 2009. Dfts may file Objections to Plaintiffs Affidavit by Friday, October 9, 2009. Pla may file a Reply by Monday, October 19, 2009. Absent good cause shown, the failure to timely file the subject Affidavit or Objections may result in the summary denial or award of the requested attorneys' fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 8/7/09. (KMG, )
February 26, 2009 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 61 , 62 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Declaratory Relief; denying 75 Motion for Status Conferance. An Amended Joint Proposed Case Management Plan will be required if the issues have changed or new issues have arisen since the filing of the Amended Complaint and Counterclaim. A Rule 16 scheduling order will be issued shortly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 2/26/09.(DMT, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AZ Holding, LLC v. Frederick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AZ Holding, LLC
Represented By: Anne Wallace Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas C Frederick
Represented By: John R Clemency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine J Cobb
Represented By: John R Clemency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBW Consultants, Inc.
Represented By: John R Clemency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bumaro LLC
Represented By: John R Clemency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Bumaro LLC
Represented By: John R Clemency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Thomas C Frederick
Represented By: John R Clemency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Christine J Cobb
Represented By: John R Clemency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: RBW Consultants, Inc.
Represented By: John R Clemency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: AZ Holding, LLC
Represented By: Anne Wallace Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Bumaro LLC
Represented By: John R Clemency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Christine J Cobb
Represented By: John R Clemency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Thomas C Frederick
Represented By: John R Clemency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: RBW Consultants, Inc.
Represented By: John R Clemency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?