Pacific Indemnity Company v. Pickens Kane Moving & Storage Company et al

Plaintiff: Pacific Indemnity Company
Defendant: Pickens Kane Moving & Storage Company, Atlas Van Lines, Inc and Does
Cross Claimant: Pickens Kane Moving & Storage Company and Atlas Van Lines, Inc
Cross Defendant: Atlas Van Lines, Inc and Pickens Kane Moving & Storage Company
Case Number: 2:2008cv00466
Filed: March 10, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 49:11702(a)(4) Violations of Interstate Commerce A
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2010 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 154 Pickens Kane's Motion for Attorney Fees and 162 Renewed Motion for reasonable expenses in the amount of $74,402.35 and denying 180 Atlas' Motion objecting to taxation of costs. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 5/6/10.(LSP)
November 25, 2009 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Pickens Kane's 155 Motion to Stay entry of judgment; judgment will be entered concurrent with this order; the motion for fees and costs will be ruled on once the parties have fully complied with the local rule. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 11/24/09.(REW, )
October 5, 2009 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Pickens Kane's 142 Motion for Reconsideration and for New Trial; granting in part and denying in part Pacific Indemnity's 144 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 10/5/09.(REW, )
September 9, 2009 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; granting Pacific Indemnity's 106 Motion for Summary Judgment on Count I against Pickens Kane and Atlas with respect to liability under 49 U.S.C. § 14706(a)(1), we conclude that Pickens Kane is liable to Pacific Indemnity in the amo unt of $1 million; granting Pickens Kane's 113 Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts II and III of the first amended complaint; granting in part and denying in part Pickens Kane's 109 Motion for Summary Judgment against Atlas Van L ines, and concluding that Atlas is liable to Pickens Kane under 49 U.S.C. § 14706(b) in the amount of $5.00 per pound of the shipment, an issue of fact remains as to the total weight of the shipment; granting in part and denying in part Atl as Van Lines' 116 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment against Pacific Indemnity and Pickens Kane, Atlas is liable to Pickens Kane in the amount of $5.00 per pound, but an issue of fact remain as to the total weight of the shipment; denying as moot Pickens Kane's 105 Motion to expedite ruling on motion for leave to file separate summary judgment motions. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 9/8/09.(REW, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Indemnity Company v. Pickens Kane Moving & Storage Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Indemnity Company
Represented By: Kevin Dale Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pickens Kane Moving & Storage Company
Represented By: John T Schriver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlas Van Lines, Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey R Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Pickens Kane Moving & Storage Company
Represented By: John T Schriver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Atlas Van Lines, Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey R Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Atlas Van Lines, Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey R Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Pickens Kane Moving & Storage Company
Represented By: John T Schriver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?