Capmark Finance, Inc. v. Deihl

Plaintiff: Capmark Finance, Inc.
Defendant: Sari Deihl
Case Number: 2:2008cv00468
Filed: March 10, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 12, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 23 Stipulation of Dismissal: this case is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own fees, costs, and expenses and the 10/15/09 Final Pre-trial Conference is VACATED. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 5/12/09. (LSP)
January 16, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/31/2009. Dispositive motions due by 9/11/2009. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2009 04:00 PM before Judge Stephen M McNamee. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/14/2009. (LAD)
December 19, 2008 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Stipulation to file First Amended Complaint, the Clerk shall file Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 12/19/08. (LSP)
November 10, 2008 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion to Continue. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference re-set for 1/14/2009 04:00 PM before Judge Stephen M McNamee. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 11/10/08.(LSP)
September 29, 2008 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Dft Mrs. Deihl's 5 Motion to Dismiss Capmark's Complaint. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 09/29/08.(ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capmark Finance, Inc. v. Deihl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capmark Finance, Inc.
Represented By: Sean Keenan McElenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sari Deihl
Represented By: Lyndon Bruce Steimel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?