Water Wheel Camp Recreational Area, Inc. et al v. LaRance et al

Plaintiff: Water Wheel Camp Recreational Area, Inc. and Robert Johnson
Defendant: Gary LaRance and Priscilla Hill
Case Number: 2:2008cv00474
Filed: March 11, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: La Paz
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2009 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 89 Motion to Stay; finding as moot 93 Motion for Leave to File; finding as moot 95 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/18/2009.(NVO)
September 23, 2009 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiffs' request for declaratory relief is denied with respect to Plaintiff Water Wheel Camp Recreational Area, Inc., and granted with respect to Plaintiff Robert Johnson. The CRIT Tribal Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction over Joh nson, and the judgment against him in Case No. CV-CO-2007- 0100 is null and void. Defendants are directed to vacate the judgment and to cease any litigation concerning Robert Johnson personally. The Clerk shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/22/09. (LSP)
August 6, 2009 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re additional briefing due by close of business 8/21/2009. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/6/2009. (NVO)
July 21, 2009 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 7/24/2009 hearing. The Court asks the parties to be prepared to address several issues at the hearing in addition to their other oral arguments. See order for details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/21/2009. (NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Water Wheel Camp Recreational Area, Inc. et al v. LaRance et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Water Wheel Camp Recreational Area, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis J Whittlesey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Johnson
Represented By: Dennis J Whittlesey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary LaRance
Represented By: Timothy Arthur Vollmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priscilla Hill
Represented By: Timothy Arthur Vollmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?