Zha v. MBL of America, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Leping Zha
Defendant: MBL of America, Inc., NextScreen LLC and Source Interlink Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2008cv00658
Filed: April 4, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Copyright Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 17:101 Copyright Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2008 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice 54 . ORDER dismissing all claims brought by Third-Party Plaintiff Source Interlink Magazines, LLC against Third-Party Defendant MBL Akustikgerate GmbH & Co. KG. with prejudice, each side to bear its own costs and fees. ORDER vacating the Status Conference set for 12/15/08 at 2:30 p.m. ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 12/3/08. (TLJ)
November 10, 2008 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 52 Third Party Plaintiff SIM's Motion to Continue. Status Conference re-set for 12/15/2008 02:30 PM before Judge Stephen M McNamee. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 11/7/08.(LSP)
November 4, 2008 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED GRANTING the 50 Stipulation of Dismissal brought by Cross-Claim Plaintiff Source Interlink Magazines, LLC against Cross-Claim Defendant MBL of America, Inc. with prejudice. This stipulation does not dismiss any claims s et forth in the Third-Party complaint of Source Interlink Magazines, LLC against MBL Akustikgerte GmbH & Co. KG. FURTHER ORDERED that the Status Conference in this case remains scheduled for Monday, 11/17/08 at 1:30p.m. to discuss the remaining Third-Party complaint of Source Interlink Magazines, LLC against MBL Akustikgerte GmbH & Co. KG. This Status Conference will be vacated upon notice to the Court of any settlement between the parties. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 11/3/08. (SAT)
October 8, 2008 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties have until 10/31/08 to file a stipulation for dismissal. ORDER that in the event no such stipulation is filed, a Status Conference is set for 11/17/2008 01:30 PM. If the stipulatin is received by 10/31/08, the status conference will be vacated Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/7/08. (TLJ)
September 24, 2008 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 45 Stipulation of Dismissal of plaintiff's claims against defendant MBL of America Inc as defendant only with prejudice, with the parties to bear their own costs and fees. Defendant MBL of America, Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/24/08. (DMT, )
September 23, 2008 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Stipulation of Dismissal of all claims brought by Plaintiff Zha against Defendants NextScreen, LLC and Source Interlink Magazines, LLC with prejudice, with the parties to bear their own costs and fees. This stipulation does not di smiss any Cross-claims brought by Source Interlink Magazines, LLC against MBL of America, Inc. or any claims set forth in the Third-Party Complaint of Source Interlink Magazines, LLC against MBL Akustikgerte GmbH & Co. KG.:, NextScreen LLC and Source Interlink Magazines, LLC terminated. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/22/08. (DMT, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zha v. MBL of America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leping Zha
Represented By: Christopher Seidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MBL of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NextScreen LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Source Interlink Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?