Martinez v. Schriro

Defendant: Dora Schriro
Petitioner: Luis Mariano Martinez
Case Number: 2:2008cv00785
Filed: April 24, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Mark E Aspey (PS)
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 27, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254), is denied with prejudice, and the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. That, in the event Petitioner files an appeal, a certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 11/27/12. (DMT)
July 2, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Petitioner shall file a supplemental brief (including objections to the Report and Recommendation) within 30 days of the date of this Order. ORDER that Respondent shall file a response to the supplemental brief within 30 days of when the brief is filed. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 7/2/12. (TLJ)
December 12, 2008 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 12 Report and Recommendations to the extent indicated above, the objections Doc. 13 & 15 are overruled to the extent indicated above, the Petition is denied, with prejudice, and the Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 12/12/08.(DNH)
September 17, 2008 12 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, : Recommending that Petition be Denied and Dismissed with Prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark E Aspey on 9/16/08. (MAP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Schriro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Luis Mariano Martinez
Represented By: Robert Donald Bartels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dora Schriro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?