Dillon, et al v. Arizona, State of et al

Plaintiff: Don Dillon and Thelma Dillion
Defendant: Michelle Heermans, Mark Peterson, Arizona Department of Economic Security, Office of Licensing, Certification & Regulation, Child Protective Services, Arizona, State of, Victoria Stevens, Eric Hobson, John and Jane Does, Janice Mickens, John Does and Jane Does
Case Number: 2:2008cv00796
Filed: April 25, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Earl H Carroll
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 19, 2010 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - ORDERED that Judgment is entered in favor of dfts. The Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/18/10. (LAD)
May 28, 2010 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 75 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/28/2010.(NVO)
April 7, 2010 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 60 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. The motion is granted with respect to all claims against the State of Arizona, DES, CPS, OLCR, and Defendants Mickens, Stevens, and Peterson. The motions is also granted with respect to all claims against Defendants Heermans and Hobson except Claim 1 and the request for punitive damages. The Court will set a final pretrial conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/6/10.(LSP)
February 20, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/20/2009.(NVO)
October 17, 2008 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 6 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and denying 10 Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Response and denying 12 Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Response. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/17/08.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dillon, et al v. Arizona, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Heermans
Represented By: Michael Gregory Gaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Peterson
Represented By: Michael Gregory Gaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Department of Economic Security
Represented By: Michael Gregory Gaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Licensing, Certification & Regulation
Represented By: Michael Gregory Gaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Child Protective Services
Represented By: Michael Gregory Gaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona, State of
Represented By: Michael Gregory Gaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Stevens
Represented By: Michael Gregory Gaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Hobson
Represented By: Michael Gregory Gaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does
Represented By: Michael Gregory Gaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Mickens
Represented By: Michael Gregory Gaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Dillon
Represented By: Shane Douglas McFetridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thelma Dillion
Represented By: Shane Douglas McFetridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?