Washington v. Schriro et al

Petitioner: Maurice Washington
Respondent: Dora Schriro and Arizona Attorney General, State of
Case Number: 2:2008cv00806
Filed: April 28, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: Mark E Aspey (PS)
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The Magistrate Judge's 15 Report and Recommendation is accepted and adopted by the Court; Petitioner's 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is dismissed and denied with prejudice; the Clerk shall close this case. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 1/6/09. (REW, )
January 5, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner's Objections to be filed by January 16, 2009. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 1/4/09.(DMT, )
December 11, 2008 15 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus: Recommending that that the petition be denied and dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark E Aspey on 12/9/2008. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Schriro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maurice Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dora Schriro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Arizona Attorney General, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?