Federal Trade Commission, v. Handicapped & Disabled Workshops, Inc., et al.,

Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Defendant: Handicapped & Disabled Workshops, Inc, Handi-Hope Industries, Inc, Handi-Ship, LLC, Bruce D Peeples, George Thomas and Joshua D Abramson
Case Number: 2:2008cv00908
Filed: May 13, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 15:0045 Federal Trade Commission Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 28, 2009 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Due to its minimal monetary value, the remaining inventory held by the Receiver shall be donated to appropriate charities. From the $419,300.10 held in the Receivership Trust Account, the Receiver may retain $10,000.00 (i) for the pur pose of paying any future unemployment tax liability relating to the filing of the 2008 unemployment tax returns for Corporate Dfts, and (ii) for the purpose of paying CPA Charles Estes for preparing said tax returns. The Receiver's application for receiver fees and costs (Dkt. ## 61 , 68 ) is approved. The Receiver is awarded a total of $44,398.98. The remaining $364,901.12 in the Receivership Trust Account, and any unused portion of the $10,000 retained by the Receiver for tax-related purposes, shall be provided to the FTC for ultimate satisfaction of claims. The Clerk is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/28/09. (NOTE: see attached pdf for complete details) (ESL)
July 22, 2009 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Status Report due by 9/25/2009. Receiver's request for a ruling on his fee application 61 is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/22/2009. (NVO)
July 6, 2009 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating 60 ORDER. Receiver shall file a status report consistent with this order by 7/17/09. Chuck Estes may be employed as the receivership accountant for purpose of filing future tax returns. Settlement and Release Agreement with John Hinson and Tenn Am Corp is approved. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/6/09. (see order for full details) (DMT, )
April 7, 2009 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. The Receiver promptly shall mail copies of the Final Report to all known creditors of Corporate Dfts with a notice stating that any objections to paying any assets of Corporate Dfts to satisfy claims, the Receiver's cos ts and expenses, or monetary jgms entered in this case must be submitted to the Court and served by mail upon the Receiver within 30 days of the mailing of the Final Report (see Dkt. #55 at 5). 2. The Receiver shall file with the Court a Notice of Mailing Final Report once the mailing is complete. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/7/09. (SAT)
October 14, 2008 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment 43 is granted in part and denied in part. The motion is granted with respect to Plaintiff's request for an award of monetary damages and denied without prejudice with resp ect to Plaintiff's request for completion of the receivership. Default Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission and against Handicapped & Disabled Workshops, Inc, Handi-Hope Industries, Inc, and Handi-Ship, LLC, in the amount of $13,411,918.00. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/14/08. (LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission, v. Handicapped & Disabled Workshops, Inc., et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Richard McKewen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Handicapped & Disabled Workshops, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Handi-Hope Industries, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Handi-Ship, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce D Peeples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua D Abramson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?