Lomeli v. Mukasey

Petitioner: Marcos Antonio Lomeli
Respondent: Michael B. Mukasey
Case Number: 2:2008cv00955
Filed: May 27, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Michelle H Burns (PS)
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 14, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis re 41 Notice of Appeal pursuant to Fed.R.App.P. 24(a)(3); denying 43 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 10/10/2009.(LAD)
August 18, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Petitioner's Motion to Supplement Petitioner's Traverse 31 is granted and the Clerk of the Court shall file Petitioner's Supplement to Traverse 32 . ORDER that Petitioner's Motion to Supplement the Record 36 is granted. ORDER that the non-mooted portions of the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation 30 are accepted and adopted by the Court. ORDER that the Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is denied and that this action is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 8/17/09. (TLJ)
March 26, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot Respondents' 14 Motion to Hold Proceedings in Abeyance Pending Extrajudicial Resolution Efforts. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 3/26/09.(REW, )
October 31, 2008 30 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus : Recommending that the Petition be denied and dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 10/31/08. (REW, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lomeli v. Mukasey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marcos Antonio Lomeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael B. Mukasey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?