Bishop v. Schriro et al

Plaintiff: Stephen Bishop
Defendant: Dora B Schriro, James Arnold, M. Degurski and Unknown Others
Case Number: 2:2008cv00964
Filed: May 21, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: Jay R Irwin (PS)
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 20, 2010 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - (1) The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 81) and Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. 89.) (2) Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. 89) i s granted, and the claims in Count II are dismissed with prejudice. (3) Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 81) is denied as moot. (4) The action is terminated, and the Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. (See document for details). Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 12/17/10.(LAD)
June 18, 2009 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Court ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation of theMagistrate Judge (Doc. #57).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED GRANTING Plaintiffs Motion to Stay (Doc. #53).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is stayed pending a decision onPlaintiffs Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed April 3, 2009 (#47). Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 6/18/2009.(TCA, )
May 20, 2009 57 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 53 MOTION to Stay re "these Proceedings" : Recommending that motion to stay be granted and that the Court order that this action be stayed pending a decision on Plaintiff's Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed April 3, 2009 (#47). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jay R Irwin on 5/19/09. (DMT, )
April 6, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED DENYING Pla's 48 Motion for Recusal. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 4/6/09.(SAT)
March 19, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 23 Plaintiff's Motion for a Court Order to Use or Possess a Typewriter; denying 24 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Show Cause to provide him a Prisoner Self-Help Litigation Manual and denying 24 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 3/19/09.(LSP)
November 5, 2008 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Pla's 17 "Motion to File Interlocutory Appeal Challenging this Court's Denial of an Interlocutory Appeal on Parties Claims Pursuant to FRCP Rule 54(a)" is denied. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 11/04/08.(ESL)
September 4, 2008 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 Motion for Leave to File Interlocutory Appeal; granting 12 Motion to Amend/Correct motion to file interlocutory appeal; denying 13 Motion to Stay.. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/4/08.(DMT, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bishop v. Schriro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dora B Schriro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Degurski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Others
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?