Itsy, LLLP et al v. CNL Resort Biltmore Real Estate, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Bert S Strug, Patricia Barr, Biltmore, LLC, Richard Barr, Michael Pollak, Shereen Pollak, Robert S Weinert, Itsy, LLLP, Howard Weiner, Karen D Weiner, Ron S Weiss, Phillip Boshaw, Weiden Family Investment, LLC, Progressive Investment Properties, LLC, Mark Dye, Jeramie Dreyfuss, Louis Gottlieb, Ruth Gottlieb, Celplast Realty International, LTD, Karen Davis, Barbara Goldberg, Jack M McElroy, Carol L McElroy, RAMS, LLC, DIADEM, LLLP, Gilbert Dye, Trifecta Investments, LLC, James Femino, Sue Femino, Stanley Averch, Roger Kent Investments, Inc., Selma Poznanovich, Clumeck Family Trust, Al Bashawaty, Gateway I, LLC, John Freidenrich, Lane Loyko, Jacar Development, L.P., Ronald R Jensen, Norman Glowinsky, Lillian Glowinsky, Bradley B Palmer and Melanie Strug
Defendant: CNL Resort Biltmore Real Estate, Inc. and KSL Biltmore Resort, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2008cv00965
Filed: May 21, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2010 230 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 229 defendants' motion for review of the clerk's award of costs and FURTHER ORDERING that each party shall bear its own costs. That part of the "Taxation of Costs Order" 228 awarding costs of $5,360.33 for plaintiffs is vacated. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 4/14/10.(DMT)
February 24, 2010 227 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 200 Hotel's Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 203 Conlon's Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 2/23/10.(TLJ)
February 23, 2010 226 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 205 Motion to Amend/Correct Judgment; denying 207 Motion for Determination of Prejudgment Interest. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 2/23/10. (DTN)
November 5, 2009 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to the foregoing Findings and Conclusions, the clerk is directed to enter final judgment in favor of the plaintiff and against the defendants in the amount of $525,000.00. This renders moot "Defendants' Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings" 176 . Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 11/4/09.(TLJ)
August 27, 2009 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Conlon's 157 Motion to Recalculate Claim Accrual Date for Statute of Limitations. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 8/26/09.(KMG, )
July 27, 2009 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying the Hotel's 129 Daubert motion to exclude the report and testimony of expert Robert Keon, and DENYING the Hotel's 130 Daubert motion to exclude the report and testimony of expert Renee Jenkins. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED GRANTI NG IN PART AND DENYING IN PART the Hotel's 132 motion for summary judgment. The Hotel's motion for summary judgment is granted only to the extent it asserts that the statute of limitations bars claims occurring before February 26, 2002. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 07/27/09. (ESL)
February 2, 2009 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Conlon's first motion 23 for leave to amend.The motion is granted to the extent that it seeks to add an additional claim of breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing, and to remove a party from the caption. The motion is denied to the extent that it seeks to add Grossman, Boca, and Morgan Stanley as defendants. FURTHER ORDERED Granting Conlon's motion 32 for permission to file a second motion for leave to amend, and Den ying Conlon's second motion 33 for leave to amend. FURTHER ORDERED Denying the motion 43 for an expedited oral argument on the motions for leave to amend. The clerk is directed to change the caption to terminate Phillip Boshaw as a plaintiff. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 1/30/09.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Itsy, LLLP et al v. CNL Resort Biltmore Real Estate, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bert S Strug
Represented By: Michael Joseph Plati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Barr
Represented By: Michael Joseph Plati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Biltmore, LLC
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Barr
Represented By: Michael Joseph Plati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Pollak
Represented By: Michael Joseph Plati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shereen Pollak
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert S Weinert
Represented By: Michael Joseph Plati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Itsy, LLLP
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Weiner
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen D Weiner
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron S Weiss
Represented By: Michael Joseph Plati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Boshaw
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weiden Family Investment, LLC
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Investment Properties, LLC
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Dye
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeramie Dreyfuss
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Gottlieb
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Gottlieb
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celplast Realty International, LTD
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Davis
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Goldberg
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack M McElroy
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol L McElroy
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAMS, LLC
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIADEM, LLLP
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert Dye
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trifecta Investments, LLC
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Femino
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue Femino
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Averch
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Kent Investments, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selma Poznanovich
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clumeck Family Trust
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al Bashawaty
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gateway I, LLC
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Freidenrich
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lane Loyko
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacar Development, L.P.
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald R Jensen
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Glowinsky
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillian Glowinsky
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley B Palmer
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Strug
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNL Resort Biltmore Real Estate, Inc.
Represented By: Monica Marie Ryden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KSL Biltmore Resort, Inc.
Represented By: Monica Marie Ryden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?