Thompson et al v. Wiener et al

Plaintiff: Laura Thompson, Justine Cox, Vickie Lutz, Lacey Chainhalt and Nicole Morgeson
Defendant: Steven H Wiener, Lauren Wiener, Steven H. Wiener, MD, P.C., Pamela S. Henderson, Pamela S. Henderson, MD, P.C., New Image Plastic Surgery, New Image Skin Spa, L.L.C., DOES I-X and Corporations A-Z
Case Number: 2:2008cv00991
Filed: May 27, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David K Duncan
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2009 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Dfts' Motion 128 for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Court grants the Motion in the following respects:1. Grants summary judgment on counts I (Sexual Harassment), II (ACRA), and IV (Constructive D ischarge) against the individual Dfts. 2. Grants summary judgment on the constructive discharge claims by Ms. Thompson, Ms. Cox, and Ms. Chainhalt against all Dfts. 3. Grants summary judgment on Count VI (Negligence Per Se) against all Dfts. The Court denies the Motion in all other respects. FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of the Court TERMINATE Dft Pamela S. Henderson, M.D., individually, from this action. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 12/17/09.(KMG, )
October 15, 2009 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 160 Motion to Supplement and ordering that Defendants file any supplement to its motion by October 23, 2009, and that Plaintiffs file any desired Sur-Reply by October 30, 2009. Defendant's Motion to Expedite 160 is denied. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/14/09.(DMT, )
November 25, 2008 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; Defendants' 14 Motion to Dismiss Counts I, II, III, IV, and VI is DENIED; Defendants' 14 Motion to Dismiss Counts V, X, and XI is GRANTED. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/24/08.(REW, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson et al v. Wiener et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justine Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Lutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lacey Chainhalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Morgeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven H Wiener
Represented By: Michelle Hamilton Ganz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Wiener
Represented By: Michelle Hamilton Ganz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven H. Wiener, MD, P.C.
Represented By: Michelle Hamilton Ganz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela S. Henderson
Represented By: Michelle Hamilton Ganz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela S. Henderson, MD, P.C.
Represented By: Michelle Hamilton Ganz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Image Plastic Surgery
Represented By: Michelle Hamilton Ganz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Image Skin Spa, L.L.C.
Represented By: Michelle Hamilton Ganz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporations A-Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?