United States of America v. Griggs

Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: David H Griggs
Case Number: 2:2008cv01016
Filed: May 30, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 26:7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2010 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED David Griggs' 94 Motion for Leave to File brief is granted. The Clerk is directed to file the 95 lodged proposed brief andsupporting 96 declaration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/23/10.(SAT)
February 4, 2010 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Grigg's 87 Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/4/10.(LAD)
December 15, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Respondent Griggs' 83 Motion for Reconsideration is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/14/09.(SAT)
December 1, 2009 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Griggs' 79 Motion for Leave to File a Reply. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/30/09.(REW, )
November 25, 2009 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Respondent's objection 76 to the R&R is denied; Magistrate Judge Mark E Aspey's R&R 75 is accepted; Respondent's motion to dismiss 27 is denied; Respondent David Griggs is ordered to comply with the Order Enforcing Summons 10 by 1/15/10. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/24/09. (REW, )
October 7, 2009 75 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, Recommending that Mr Griggs' 27 MOTION titled "Supplemental Response to Petitioner's Motion for Contempt and MOTION to Dismiss Order Enforcing Summons" be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark E Aspey on 10/6/09. (REW, )
February 18, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Government's Motion to Dismiss Griggs' Petition to Quash Third Party Summons; Griggs' Petition to Quash Third Party Summons is denied. The Clerk is directed to terminate Case No. MC 08-103. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED gra nting 47 Government's Motion for Leave to File Reply. Griggs' motion to dismiss order enforcing summons 27 is referred to Magistrate Judge Mark E. Aspey to prepare a report and recommendation for this Court. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/18/09. (cc: 9CCA)(LSP)
January 8, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant's Griggs' 43 Motion for Leave to File Response; the Clerk is directed to file the 44 lodged proposed response. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/8/09.(REW, )
December 4, 2008 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER David Griggs has requested appointed counsel in this case. If Griggs still seeks the appointment of counsel, he may request that his lodged financial affidavit 35 be filed publicly and not under seal. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/4/08. (TLJ)
November 5, 2008 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Respondent's 19 Motion for Leave to File supplemental response is granted; The Clerk shall file the 20 proposed supplemental response. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/03/08.(ESL)
October 31, 2008 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ; Hearing set for 11/5/2008 03:00 PM before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/31/08. (REW, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Griggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Robert K Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David H Griggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?