Richardson v. Stanley Works, Inc.

Plaintiff: David A Richardson
Defendant: Stanley Works Inc.
Case Number: 2:2008cv01040
Filed: June 3, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Patent Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:271 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2009 55 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk enter jgm against Pla and in favor of Dft and that Pla take nothing. The Clerk shall terminate this action. FURTHER ORDERED that Pla's 46 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment on willful infringement is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 4/6/09.(SAT)
February 13, 2009 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Motion to Strike 25 Jury Demand. FURTHER ORDERD that pla's alternative motion for jury trial under Rule 39(b) 35 is denied. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 2/13/2009. (LAD)
November 6, 2008 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Dft Stanley Works, Inc.'s motion to dismiss Count II 10 is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that Count II of Pla's Complaint (Common Law Unfair Competition) is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 11/6/08.(KMG, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Stanley Works, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A Richardson
Represented By: Daniel J Noblitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Works Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?