Kravetz v. Paul Revere Life Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Dennis Kravetz
Defendant: Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Unum Group and UnumProvident Corporation
Case Number: 2:2008cv01060
Filed: June 6, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Insurance Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2009 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 102 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production; see PDF document for details. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 9/24/09.(LSP)
June 11, 2009 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 63 Motion to Compel with the limitation that defendants are not to access the substance of any documents contained on plaintiff's hard drives or media storage devices; denying 68 Motion for Extension of Time to file opposition to defendants' motion to compel on grounds of mootness. Granting 74 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Neil Alden, Esq. and Curtis Bergen, Esq. of the law firm Jardine Baker Hickman & Houston, PLLC are substituted as attorneys of record for Leo Kahn, M.D.. Added attorney Neil C Alden for Leo Kahn, Curtis Marshall Bergen for Leo Kahn. Attorney Dustin Allan Christner terminated. Granting 75 Motion to Withdraw previously filed opposition to defendants' motion to compel and motion for protective order; denying 77 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 6/10/09.(DMT, )
January 12, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Kahn's 24 Motion to Quash; granting pla's 29 Motion to Compel. The parties, and non-party Kahn, are encouraged to cooperate in finding practical solutions to their concerns. They are also reminded of the 2 page limit on discovery motions under this court's order of 9/12/08 at 3 paragraph 9 ( 17 ). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 1/9/2009.(LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kravetz v. Paul Revere Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Kravetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Revere Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Ricki Lynn Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Group
Represented By: Ricki Lynn Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnumProvident Corporation
Represented By: Ricki Lynn Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?