Garduno's of Arizona, LLC v. Tortilla, Inc.

Plaintiff: Garduno's of Arizona, LLC
Defendant: Tortilla, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2008cv01090
Filed: June 10, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2011 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 112 Defendant's Motion for Entry of Stipulated Judgment; granting 113 Defendant's Motion for Summary Disposition. Judgment shall be awarded in favor of Defendant Tortilla, Inc. and against Plaintiff Garduno's of Ariz ona, LLC, Camarones Restaurant & Cantina at Gainey Ranch, LLC f/k/a Garduno's Chile Packing Company at Gainey Ranch, LLC, Caliente Gourmet International, LLC, and Camarones Restaurant & Cantina at Glendale, LLC f/k/a Garduno's of Mexico at Glendale, LLC in the principal sum of $170,000.00 together with interest at the rate of 10% per annum from the date of default until paid in full. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/7/11.(TLJ)
September 8, 2009 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 85 Motion to Strike 42 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 65 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Settlement Agreement Should Not Be Enforced. Court's amended case management order 83 remains in effect. The parties are held to the schedule set forth in that order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/8/2009.(NVO)
April 29, 2009 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 71 Motion to Reopen Case. The Clerk is directed to reopen this case. Within 20 days of the date of this order, the parties shall either file a stipulated dismissal of this case or will contact the Court to schedule a telephone conference call to re-establish the schedule in this litigation. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/28/2009. (LAD)
September 16, 2008 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/16/2008.(NVJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garduno's of Arizona, LLC v. Tortilla, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garduno's of Arizona, LLC
Represented By: Joseph E Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tortilla, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Harris Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?