Arizona Bank & Trust v. Ramundo et al

Plaintiff: Arizona Bank & Trust
Defendant: Mark A Ramundo and Jane Doe Ramundo
Case Number: 2:2008cv01193
Filed: June 27, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Roslyn O Silver
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Default

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2010 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff Arizona Bank & Trust's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses (Doc. 69) is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in the amount of $45,641.20, plus interest from the date of judgment until paid, in favor of the Plaintiff and against the Defendant. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 9/28/10.(KMG)
October 8, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice pla's 30 Motion for Summary Judgment. Pla may re-file a motion for summary judgment after the close of discovery but within the dispositive motion deadline as outlined in this Court's Rule 16 Scheduling Ord er 35 . FURTHER ORDERED that dft Mark A. Ramundo's response to pla's motion for summary judgment and in the alternative motion for Rule 56(f) relief is granted to the extent that he is seeking Rule 56(f) relief. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 10/8/2009. (LAD)
June 24, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 9 Motion Pursuant to Rule 16(f). Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 6/24/09.(REW, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arizona Bank & Trust v. Ramundo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona Bank & Trust
Represented By: Scott B Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A Ramundo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Ramundo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?