Anderson v. Maricopa County et al

Plaintiff: Robert Anderson
Defendant: Maricopa County, Maricopa Integrated Health System, Sue Erie, Gene Cavallo and Sheryl McCarthy
Case Number: 2:2008cv01286
Filed: July 11, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2008 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties, by and through their counsel, shall comply with the following deadlines which were mostly agreed to by all counsel. Discovery due by 10/16/2009. Dispositive motions due by 11/30/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 10/01/08. (see attached pdf for full details)(ESL, )
September 4, 2008 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 10/1/2008 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/3/08. (DMT, )
September 2, 2008 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the order 20 TO SHOW CAUSE is Discharged as same is complied with. Scheduling order will issue shortly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/2/08. (DMT, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Maricopa County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa Integrated Health System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Erie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene Cavallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Anderson
Represented By: John Neal Wilborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?