Prince v. Schriro et al

Petitioner: Larry Joe Prince
Respondent: Dora Schriro and Arizona Attorney General, State of
Case Number: 2:2008cv01299
Filed: July 14, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Referring Judge: Jay R Irwin (PS)
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 27, 2012 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 75 . Petitioner's second claim for habeas relief alleging juror misconduct is dismissed with prejudice. That Petitioner's grounds one and three are denied. That a certificate of appealability be denied. The Court finds that with respect to ground two jurists of reason would not find it debatable whether this Court was correct in its procedural ruling and with respect to grounds one and three Petitioner's constitutional claims are plainly without merit. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 4/26/12. (DMT)
May 22, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. the Magistrate Judge's 28 Report and Recommendation is adopted as the order of this Court; granting 22 Motion for Pro Se Legal Materials; Respondents are directed to take steps necessary so that during the pendency of this proceeding Petitioner is permitted access to his typewriter for reasonable periods of time for preparing legal documents for filing with this Court. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 5/22/09. (REW, )
March 2, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 22 MOTION for Prose Legal Materials (Typewriter): Recommending that the motion be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jay R Irwin on 2/27/2009. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prince v. Schriro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Larry Joe Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dora Schriro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Arizona Attorney General, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?