Singer v. Duro et al

Plaintiff: Alan Singer
Defendant: Harvey Duro, Sr., Josefino C. David, Lilian J. David, Desert Mobilehome Park, Inc. and Does
Case Number: 2:2008cv01304
Filed: July 15, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Yuma
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2009 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Pla's 96 Motion for Reconsideration is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/02/09.(ESL)
September 2, 2009 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Pla's 78 Motion for Partial Summary Jgm is denied.Dfts' 81 Motion for Summary Jgm is granted. The only claims remaining in this case are those against DMP, and DMP has preserved a defense of offset against Pla. Pla's 82 Motion to Strike is denied. Pla's 90 Second Motion for Partial Summary Jgm is denied. The Court will set a Final Pretrial Conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/2/09.(SAT)
June 19, 2009 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 72 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions. Plaintiff's request for certification of appeal, 73 , is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/19/09.(LSP)
April 22, 2009 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Defendants' motion for relief from failure to timely file responses to request for admissions 63 is granted. If Plaintiff wishes to file a motion for sanction personally against Mr. Zundel for the reasons stated in this order, the mot ion must not exceed five pages and must be filed by May 8, 2009. Mr. Zundel shall respond by May 15, 2009. No reply shall be filed. The Court has scheduled a telephone conference call on April 30, 2009 at 2:30 p.m. to discuss reopening the discover y period. The parties shall jointly place a call to the Court at that time. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 51 and Defendants' motion for summary judgment 62 are denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/22/09.(DMT, )
March 20, 2009 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 44 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/09.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singer v. Duro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey Duro, Sr.
Represented By: J Scott Zundel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josefino C. David
Represented By: J Scott Zundel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lilian J. David
Represented By: J Scott Zundel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desert Mobilehome Park, Inc.
Represented By: J Scott Zundel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Represented By: J Scott Zundel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?