Sandpiper Resorts Development Corporation, et al. v. Global Realty Investments, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Sandpiper Resorts Development Corporation
Defendant: Global Realty Investments, LLC, Caroline Hartman-Altenbernd, Kelly Altenbernd and Toscana Developers, LLC
Case Number: 2:2008cv01360
Filed: July 24, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2013 384 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION, the motion to amend 368 is granted as follows: Paragraphs 8, 10, 19, 24 and 33 of the JSUF are corrected to delete "/TD" and "/Toscana Developers;" and paragraph 42 is corrected to delete "Estes and Hartman signed the service agreements.", re: Joint Statement 331 . Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 6/4/13.(REW)
April 10, 2013 349 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER with court's ruling on objections to exhibits and deposition designations. See PDF document. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 4/10/13. (JWS)
January 24, 2013 317 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION, denying the 308 Motion for Attorney Fees without prejudice and with leave to renew, and, if appropriate, expand the motion to include a request for an award against Estes Development, LLC, following resolution of the claim again st it; Counsel will confer and within 7 days advise the court whether they can be available for the two-day trial during the weeks of April 1 [the court is not available April 4 and 5], April 15, or April 29, 2013, and if so, identify all of the dates that are mutually acceptable. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 1/23/13. (REW)
October 16, 2012 301 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION, granting in part and denying in part the 292 Motion for Default Judgment as follows: (1) Plaintiff Sandpiper shall have judgment against defaulting defendants Global Realty Investments, LLC; Caroline Hartman-Altenbernd; Kelly Al tenbernd; and Toscana Developers, LLC jointly and severally in the amount of $747,500, which consists of compensatory damages in the amount of $347,500 and punitive damages in the amount of $400,000. (2) Plaintiff Dourian Foster shall have judgment against defaulting defendants Global Realty Investments, LLC; Caroline Hartman-Altenbernd; Kelly Altenbernd; and Toscana Developers, LLC jointly and severally in the amount of $200,000. (3) The Clerk shall enter judgments accordingly. The case shall not be closed at this time, because the court has not yet resolved the veil-piercing claim concerning the liability of defendant Estes Development. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 10/15/12. (REW)
September 19, 2012 299 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION, this court concludes that discovery relating to the back-up plan is not warranted; it follows that plaintiffs' motion 288 seeking leave to file a renewed motion to compel discovery lacks merit and is denied. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 9/19/12.(REW)
August 6, 2012 286 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Mohr Hackett's 221 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The Estes Defendants' 225 , 227 , 228 and 230 Motions for Summary Judgment are GRANTED. The Estes Defendants' 229 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANT ED in part and DENIED in part: It is denied as it pertains to piercing Toscana Developers corporate veil to impose liability on Estes Development. It is granted as it pertains to piercing Estes Development's corporate veil to impose liability on Cynthia Estes. Plaintiffs' 269 Motion to Strike is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 8/6/2012. (See attached PDF for complete details.)(LFIG)
June 5, 2012 254 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 201 Motion to Compel. Plaintiffs' motion to compel at docket 201 is DENIED without prejudice to renewal if the parties are unable to resolve the dispute after personal consultation. It is ORDERED that the parties confer in person a t a mutually agreeable time and location within ten days from the date of this order. If the parties are unable to agree on a time or location, the parties shall meet at the office of plaintiffs counsel at 9:00 a.m. on June 15, 2012. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 6/5/12.(JWS)
February 20, 2012 188 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 155 Motion to Exclude Damage Evidence or, In the Alternative MOTION to Extend Disclosure Deadlines and Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; 160 Motion to Strike. The motion at docket 155 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as follows: Discovery deadlines subsequent to the filing of the motion at docket 155 are extended for an additional 30 days. Plaintiffs' motion to strike at docket 160 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 2/20/12.(JWS)
February 16, 2011 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 87 Motion for Reconsideration. Entry of default as to Estes Development was properly vacated. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 2/16/11.(JWS)
August 12, 2010 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED granting Dft Estes' 70 Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default as to 61 Clerk's Entry of Default - Cynthia Estes and 48 Clerk's Entry of Default - Estes Corporation. FURTHER ORDERED directing the Estes Dfts to file an answer no later than 14 days from the date of this Order. FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot Pla's 65 Motion (Request) for Determination of Damages and for Entry of Default Jgm Against Dfts. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 8/11/10. (SAT)
December 21, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 12/21/09. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED denying Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Dkt.#33)IT IS FURTHER ORDERED permitting Plaintiffs to serve the Altenbernds by publication in accordance with the Arizona Rules of Civil Pro cedure no later than 45 days from the date of this Order.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Serve Defendant Cynthia Estes by Publication (Dkt.#42) no later than 45 days from the date of this Order in accordance with the Ari zona Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting Plaintiffs Motion to Deem Service on Estes Development Corporation Valid (Dkt.#42).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot Plaintiffs Motion for Hearing on the aforementioned motion (Dkt.#43).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot Plaintiffs Motion for Status Hearing (Dkt.#44). (KSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandpiper Resorts Development Corporation, et al. v. Global Realty Investments, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Realty Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caroline Hartman-Altenbernd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Altenbernd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toscana Developers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandpiper Resorts Development Corporation
Represented By: Donald O Loeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?