Dolezal v. Fritch et al

Plaintiff: Ruby Dolezal
Defendant: Randall Fritch and Cari Bond
Case Number: 2:2008cv01362
Filed: July 24, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 24, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Because Defendants have filed for bankruptcy 21 , further prosecution of this case is stayed. Plaintiff shall file a status report no later than June 19, 2009, concerning the status of Defendants' bankruptcy and what action, if any, should be taken in this case. Case stayed. Stay Deadline set for 7/22/2009. Status Report due by 6/19/2009. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/23/09. (DMT, )
December 12, 2008 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Motion to Vacate. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/12/2008.(NVJ)
October 24, 2008 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED Pla's 11 Motion for Default Judgment is granted. Jgm on Plas claim for fraudulent transfer is entered in favor of Pla and against Dfts in the amount of $250,000.00. The Clerk is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/23/08.(SAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dolezal v. Fritch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Dolezal
Represented By: Harry Norman Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Fritch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cari Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?