Saguaro Medical Associates, P.C., et al v. Banner Health

Plaintiff: Saguaro Medical Associates, P.C. and Rakesh Malhotra
Defendant: Banner Health
Case Number: 2:2008cv01386
Filed: July 28, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1981 Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2010 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 165 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/10/2010.(NVO)
February 2, 2010 194 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 154 Motion in Limine; denying 155 Motion in Limine; deferring ruling on 156 Motion in Limine; taking under advisement 157 Motion in Limine; granting 158 Motion in Limine; denying 159 Motion in Li mine; denying 160 Motion in Limine; granting 161 Motion in Limine; denying 162 Motion in Limine; denying 163 Motion in Limine; denying 164 Motion in Limine; taking under advisement 165 Motion in Limine; denying 166 Motion in Limine; def erring ruling on 167 Motion in Limine; deferring ruling on 168 Motion for Sanctions. Trial in this matter is set for 2/25/2010, 2/26/2010, 3/2/2010, 3/3/2010, 3/4/2010, 3/5/2010. Final conference set for 2/23/2010 at 4:30 PM before the Honorable David G. Campbell, United States Federal Courthouse, 401 West Washington Street, Courtroom 603, Phoenix, AZ 85003. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/2/2010.(NVO)
January 22, 2010 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 135 Motion for Ruling re request for access to sealed documents. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/22/2010.(NVO)
December 22, 2009 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 136 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/22/2009.(NVO)
November 6, 2009 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 107 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 114 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/6/2009.(NVO)
August 31, 2009 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 116 Motion to Strike. Plaintiffs shall file a response to Defendant's summary judgment motion 114 on or before 9/11/2009. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/31/2009.(NVO)
April 21, 2009 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 84 discovery conference with parties on 4/16/09: Issues addressed and this order will reflect the court's rulings on those issues. (see order for details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/20/09. (DMT, )
September 26, 2008 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Motion to Dismiss Case; denying 8 Motion to Dismiss Counts/Claims; granting 12 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint on or before 10/3/2008. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/26/2008.(NVJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saguaro Medical Associates, P.C., et al v. Banner Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saguaro Medical Associates, P.C.
Represented By: Lonnie James Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rakesh Malhotra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banner Health
Represented By: Andrew S Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?