Sperber-Porter et al v. Kell

Plaintiff: Mark Svejda and Eva Sperber-Porter
Case Number: 2:2008cv01424
Filed: August 1, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT Pla's 28 Motion to Dissolve Stay is DENIED. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 9/4/09.(SAT)
June 8, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 21 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/8/09.(DMT, )
April 2, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Dft's Motion to Dismiss 17 is DENIED except insofar as it requests a stay. FURTHER ORDERED that this action is STAYED pending resolution of the state court action. FURTHER ORDERED directing the parties to file a joint status report on July 2, 2009, and every ninety (90) days thereafter until this matter is either resolved or the stay is lifted. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 4/2/09.(KMG, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sperber-Porter et al v. Kell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Svejda
Represented By: Richard R Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Sperber-Porter
Represented By: Richard R Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?