Dillon Real Estate Co., Inc. et al v. American National Insurance Co. et al
Plaintiff: |
Dillon Real Estate Co., Inc. and Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc. |
Defendant: |
American National Insurance Co. and Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. |
Case Number: |
2:2008cv01508 |
Filed: |
August 15, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Arizona |
Office: |
Contract: Other Office |
County: |
Maricopa |
Presiding Judge: |
Frederick J Martone |
Presiding Judge: |
|
Nature of Suit: |
Defendant |
Cause of Action: |
Diversity |
Jury Demanded By: |
28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 24, 2010 |
Filing
266
ORDER granting plaintiff's 254 Motion to Enforce Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 11/23/10. (ESL)
|
November 10, 2010 |
Filing
259
ORDER denying 222 American National Insurance Company's Motion for Judgment as a matter of law. IT IS FURTHER ORDER that the clerk shall tax costs in the amount of $6,792.81 in favor of Dollar Tree Stores and against plaintiffs and $ 9,053.31 in favor of plaintiffs and against American National Insurance Company. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying 214 American National Insurance Company's Motion for Attorney Fees and denying 219 its Bill of Costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granti ng 212 Dollar Tree Stores' Motion for Attorney Fees in the amount of $151,841.00 against plaintiffs and granting in part and denying in part 215 Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney Fees; Plaintiffs are awarded $571,304.75 against American National Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 11/9/10.(LSP)
|
April 26, 2010 |
Filing
210
ORDER granting Plas' Renewed Motion 197 for Permanent Injunction. All the claims of all the parties having been resolved, the clerk is now directed to enter final judgment as follows: 1. In favor of Plaintiffs Dillon Real Estate Co., and Smith 's Food & Drug Centers, Inc. (Fry's) and against Defendant American National Insurance Co. (Anico), pursuant to the jury's verdict in the amount of $172,565.00. 2. The defendant Anico is permanently enjoined from allowing Dollar T ree to sell groceries (food and non-food household supplies) in the Heatherwood Plaza shopping center. Anico cannot rely on its inconsistent lease provisions with Dollar Tree to avoid compliance. It had no power to grant inconsistent provisions. The lease was expressly subject to the declaration. Any term in the lease that is inconsistent with the declaration is void. 3. In favor of Dollar Tree and against Plaintiffs (Fry's) on Plaintiffs' complaint pursuant to our order of July 17, 2009, granting summary judgment in favor of Dollar Tree. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 4/26/10.(KMG)
|
September 25, 2009 |
Filing
136
ORDER denying 118 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; see PDF document for details. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 9/25/09.(LSP)
|
July 17, 2009 |
Filing
125
ORDER granting 79 Dollar Tree's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 7/17/09.(LSP)
|
December 11, 2008 |
Filing
37
ORDER denying plas' 33 Motion for Hearing on Motion.; denying plas' 15 Motion for Judgment. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 12/10/2008.(LAD)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?