Arizona Cardinals Football Club, Inc. et al v. Bryant et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Arizona Cardinals Football Club, Inc. and the National Football League Management Council seek to confirm an arbitration award against Defendants Wendell Bryant and the National Football League Players Association.

Plaintiff: National Football League Management Council and Arizona Cardinals Football Club, Inc.
Defendant: Wendell Bryant and National Football League Players Association
Case Number: 2:2008cv01541
Filed: August 20, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT: ORDERED that plas' motion for default judgment 18 is granted. The arbitration award in the amount of $2,767,778.00 (see Dkt #1-2 at 23-24) is confirmed. Default judgment is entered in favor of plas and against dft Wendell Bryant in the amount of $2,767,778.00, plus interest. Plas are awarded attorneys' fees and costs in the amount of $6,763.00. The Clerk is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/6/2009. (LAD, )
February 24, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 16 Motion for Default Judgment. Plaintiffs shall have until 3/20/2009 to file a new motion for default judgment. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/24/2009.(NVO)
September 17, 2008 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Plaintiffs shalll show cause in writing by 9/30/08 why their claims against Defendants Wendell Bryant and the National Football League Players Association should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with this Court's Orders and failure to prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 9/30/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/17/08. (REW, )
August 20, 2008 1
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 350.00, receipt number 09700000000002167027, filed by Arizona Cardinals Football Club, Inc., National Football League Management Council. ADDITIONAL CORRECTIVE ENTRY DUE TO ATTORNEY SELECTING INCORRECT EVENT FOR INITIATING DOCUMENT.(CMH, ) Modified on 8/21/2008 (CMH, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arizona Cardinals Football Club, Inc. et al v. Bryant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Football League Management Council
Represented By: Michael Rudolph Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona Cardinals Football Club, Inc.
Represented By: Michael K Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendell Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Football League Players Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?