Madison v. First Magnus Financial Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Sherryl L Madison
Defendant: First Magnus Financial Corporation, Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., GMAC Mortgage, LLC, Transnational Financial Network, Inc., Fremont Investment & Loan Company, Homecomings Financial Network, LLC, Indy Mac Bank, FSB, US Bank National Association, Fidelity National Foreclosure Solutions, AMC Mortgage Services, Inc., Unified Capital Group, Inc., Community Lending Service, Inc., Argent Mortgage Company, LLC, Washington Mutual Home Loan Servicing, Litton Loans and HomeEq Servicing Inc.
Case Number: 2:2008cv01562
Filed: August 25, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Real Property: Foreclosure Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2009 257 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Dfts' 188 Motion to Dismiss. That Dfts IndyMac Bank and IndyMac Federal Bank are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 09/08/09.(ESL)
August 31, 2009 255 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the 209 Motion to Dismiss of Dfts AMC and Argent is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Dfts AMC Mortgage Services and Argent Mortgage Company are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/31/09. (SAT)
August 20, 2009 254 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 189 Motion to Dismiss ; granting 192 Motion to Dismiss ; granting 211 Motion to Dismiss ; granting 214 Motion to Dismiss ; granting 215 motion to dismiss, granting 225 Motion to Dismiss ; granting 246 Motion for summary d isposition ; granting 249 Motion for Protective Order; granting 251 Motion for summary disposition. That Defendants Litton Loan Servicing, U.S. Bank National As sociation, HomEq Servicing, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Washington Mutu al Bank, DHI Title of Arizona, Eva Espinoza, Sterling Mortgage, GMAC Mortgage, Homecomings Financial, and Executive Trustee Services are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiff may not conduct discovery involving Defendants Eva Espinoza and Monique Mald onado, including depositions scheduled for August 26, 2009, until the parties have conferred as required by Rule 26(f) or otherwise stipulate. That Plaintiff show cause as to why she should not be required to pay Defendant DHI Title of Arizona and E va Espinoza's reasonable expenses incurred in making their motion for a protective order. Plaintiff shall file a memorandum doing so before 5:00 P.M. on AUGUST 31, 2009. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(a)(5). Defendants DHI Title of Arizona and Eva Espinoza shall otherwise comply with Local Rule 54 (d) before 5:00 P.M. on AUGUST 31, 2009. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/19/09.(DMT, )
August 3, 2009 241 Opinion or Order of the Court VACATED WITH RESPECT TO CONSOLIDATION PER ORDER 253 OF 8/19/09 - CONSOLIDATION ORDER - LEAD CASE CV 08-1562 PHX-GMS consolidated with Member Cases CV 09-1176 PHX-JAT and CV 09-1508 PHX-MEA. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED granting 184 and 232 Motions t o Consolidate of Plaintiff Sherryl Madison and Defendants IndyMac Bank and IndyMac Federal Bank. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying 236 Motion for Additional Time of Plaintiff Sherryl Madison; granting 210 Motion to Quash Subpoena of Defendants Eva Es pinoza, DHI Title, and Monique Yabo; granting 183 and 235 Motions to Dismiss and Motions for Summary Disposition of Defendant Fidelity National Foreclosure Solutions and 187 and 227 Motions to Dismiss and Motions for Summary Disposition of De fendants Fremont Investment & Loan and Mortgage Electronic. Defendants Fidelity National Foreclosure Solutions, Fremont Investment & Loan, and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying 233 and 226 Motion for Reconsideration and Motion for Summary Disposition of Defendant IndyMac Bank and IndyMac Federal Bank; denying 229 Argent Mortgage Company and AMC Mortgage Services Joinder in the Motions for Summary Disposition of Defendants I ndyMac Bank, IndyMac Federal Bank, Fremont Investment & Loan, and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Defendants Argent Mortgage Company and AMC Mortgage Services are to file their reply brief to 209 their Motion to Dism iss by August 14, 2009. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying 230 Motion for Summary Disposition of Defendants HomEq Servicing and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems. Case No. CV-09-1176- PHX-JAT and Case No. CV-09-1508-PHX-MEA are TRANSFERRED to this Division. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/31/09. (LSP) Modified on 8/19/2009 (DMT, ).
June 16, 2009 193 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 190 Plaintiff's Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/16/09.(LSP)
June 11, 2009 186 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 176 Application for Restraining Order/Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/10/09.(DMT, )
April 28, 2009 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 145 Motion for Relief of Pla Sherryl Madison. FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk to reopen this matter. FURTHER ORDERED that because the 2nd amended complaint and notices of lis pendens filed on 4/20/09 (dkt. ##156, 159-64) were unt imely and because pla was represented by counsel at the time, pla is directed to either file a new 2nd amended complaint or file notice that she adopts the 2nd amended complaint which was improperly filed ( 156 ) on or before 5/29/09. FURTHER ORDERED granting 166 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney conditioned upon his compliance with Local Rule of Civil Procedure 83.3(b). Counsel is directed to provide the current address and phone number of Ms. Madison to the Court by 5/1/09 and timely serve the information upon all other parties or their attorneys. FURTHER ORDERED directing Mr. Jung to mail a copy of this order to Ms. Madison on or before 4/28/09. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 4/27/2009. (LAD)
March 19, 2009 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 87 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Counts/Claims; granting 88 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Case; granting 89 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Case; and granting 96 Defendants' Motion Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDER ED that 81 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is dismissed; on or before 3/31/09, Plaintiff shall file and serve a Second Amended Complaint or a statement that she abandons her claims. If Plaintiff fails to comply the Clerk is directed to terminate this matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting 130 Defendants' Motion to Strike; granting 134 Defendants' Motion to Strike; and granting 139 Defendants' Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/19/09.(LSP)
March 12, 2009 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the 90 Motion to Dismiss Defendant IndyMacBank is GRANTED pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1). FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of the Court to dismiss Dft IndyMac Bank, FSB from this action. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/12/09.(SAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madison v. First Magnus Financial Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherryl L Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Magnus Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transnational Financial Network, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fremont Investment & Loan Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homecomings Financial Network, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indy Mac Bank, FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Foreclosure Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMC Mortgage Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unified Capital Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Lending Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argent Mortgage Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual Home Loan Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Litton Loans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HomeEq Servicing Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?