Carter v. Arpaio

Plaintiff: Robert Dean Carter, Jr.
Defendant: Joseph Arpaio
Case Number: 2:2008cv01651
Filed: September 8, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prisoner - Prison Condition Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: Mark E Aspey (PS)
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference is withdrawn from the Magistrate Judge as to dft's motion to dismiss. Dft's 11 Motion to Dismiss is granted. This action is dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/13/2009. (LAD)
April 14, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ***VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER 18 FILED 6/4/09*** ORDER granting Dft's 11 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot Dft's 13 Motion for Summary Determination. Pla's action is dismissed without prejudice as barred by the statute of limitations or alternately, for failure to respond. The Clerk of Court shall enter a judgment of dismissal accordingly. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 04/14/09. (ESL) Modified on 6/16/2009 (LAD).
October 28, 2008 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet) Pla's 5 Application/Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is granted. Pla's allegations of negligence are dismissed without prejudice. Dft Arpaio must answer Counts I-III. The Clerk of Court must send Pla a service pa cket including the 1 Complaint, this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Dft Arpaio. Pla must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 20 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Mark E. Aspey pursuant for further proceedings. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/28/08. (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Arpaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Dean Carter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Arpaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?