Mortensen et al v. Home Loan Center, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: George L. Mortensen and Erna H. Mortensen
Defendant: RLI Insurance Company, Home Loan Center, Inc, Kenneth J. Block and Anthony Gutierrez
Case Number: 2:2008cv01669
Filed: September 10, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1601 Truth in Lending

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2010 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants' 73 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted and Plaintiff's 76 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk enter judgment in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff. The Clerk shall terminate this case. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 07/28/10. (ESL)
August 17, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion for leave to file first amended complaint. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint consistent with this order by August 12, 2009. Plaintiffs shall serve process on the new defendants by August 28, 2009. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 8/17/09.(DMT, )
January 16, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion to Dismiss Case; denying 18 Motion to Remand to State Court. Case Management Hearing will be set by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/16/2009.(NVO)
September 23, 2008 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that plaintiff has to 10/21/08 to respond to re 8 MOTION to Dismiss Case. Defendants have to 11/10/08 to file reply to response if any. The Motion to Dismiss shall be deemed ready for a decision on the day following the date set for filing the Reply unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/22/08. (DMT, )
September 18, 2008 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER striking without prejudice Defendants' 6 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/18/08.(REW, )
September 12, 2008 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants Home Loan Center, Inc., Kenneth J. Block and RLI Insurance Company shall file on or before Friday, 09/26/08, their written elections to either consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction or elect to proceed before a United States d istrict judge. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall either consent to proceed before a magistrate judge or elect to proceed before a district judge by 10/02/08. FURTHER ORDERED that defense counsel shall use proper capitalization in all future captions as mandated by LRCiv 7.1 (a)(3). FURTHER ORDERED that counsel and any party, if unrepresented, shall use the above caption, number and initials until further order of theCourt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 09/12/08. (DNH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mortensen et al v. Home Loan Center, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RLI Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael S Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Loan Center, Inc
Represented By: Michael S Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth J. Block
Represented By: Michael S Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George L. Mortensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erna H. Mortensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?