BAE Systems Mobility & Protection Systems Inc. et al v. Armorworks Enterprises, LLC

Plaintiff: BAE Systems Mobility & Protection Systems Inc. and BAE Systems Aerospace & Defense Group Inc.
Defendant: Armorworks Enterprises, L.L.P.
Case Number: 2:2008cv01697
Filed: September 15, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Anti-Trust Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2011 245 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that BAE Systems' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. # 215 , 228 ) is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that ArmorWorks Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability (Doc. # 222 ) is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 3/28/11. (SAT)
January 19, 2011 239 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Pursuant to stipulation (doc. 238), the Court grants the stipulation to the extent that oral argument on the following pending motions is reset from 2/14/2011 to 3/9/2011 at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 503, in Phoenix, Arizona: 228 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, 222 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability, and 215 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 1/19/2011. (TLB)
April 14, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSOLIDATION ORDER - LEAD CASE granting BAE's 23 Motion to Transfer and Consolidate CV08-1697-PHX-JAT with CV 08-2060-PHX-FJM. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall transfer CV 08-2060-PHX-FJM to this Court and consolidate i t with CV08-1697-PHX-JAT. All future filings shall bear case number CV08-1697-PHX-JAT as the lead case. All future filings related to these cases shall be filed in CV08-1697-PHX-JAT. A copy of this order shall be provided to District Judge Frederick J. Martone. Vacating oral argument currently set for 04/20/09. Denying ArmorWorks' 17 Motion to Dismiss. ArmorWorks shall answer within 20 days of this Order. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 04/13/09. (ESL)
September 22, 2008 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiffs shall file their written elections to either consent to magistrate-judge jurisdiction or elect to proceed before a United States district judge on or before Monday, September 29, 2008. That Defendant shall file its written elect ion to either consent to magistrate-judge jurisdiction or elect to have this case assigned to a United States district judge within 20 days of its appearance herein or as otherwise directed by the Court. That counsel and any party, if unrepresented, shall hereinafter comply with the Rules of Practice for the United States District Court for the District of Arizona. That counsel and any party, if unrepresented, shall use the above caption, number and initials until further order of the Court.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/19/08. (DMT, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAE Systems Mobility & Protection Systems Inc. et al v. Armorworks Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAE Systems Mobility & Protection Systems Inc.
Represented By: Charles A Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAE Systems Aerospace & Defense Group Inc.
Represented By: Charles A Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armorworks Enterprises, L.L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?