Perez-Valenzuela v. Schriro et al

Petitioner: Jose Alfred Perez-Valenzuela
Respondent: Dora B. Schriro and Arizona Attorney General, State of
Case Number: 2:2008cv01724
Filed: September 18, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Referring Judge: Edward C Voss (PS)
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 18 . The petition for writ of habeas corpus 1 is denied. The Clerk is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/4/2010. (LAD)
September 2, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court DOCUMENT #19 VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER #22 FILED ON 9/25/09. ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - IT IS ORDERED: Magistrate Judge Edward C. Voss's 18 Report and Recommendation is accepted. Petitioner Jose Alfred Perez-Valenzuela's 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpusis denied and dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/2/09. (SAT) Modified on 9/25/2009 (LSP).
July 29, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus: Recommending that the Petition be DENIED and DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward C Voss on 7/29/2009. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez-Valenzuela v. Schriro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Alfred Perez-Valenzuela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dora B. Schriro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Arizona Attorney General, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?