Eljammal v. Humetewa et al

Petitioner: Moustapha Lotfi Eljammal
Respondent: Diane J. Humetewa and Michael B. Mukasey
Case Number: 2:2008cv01778
Filed: September 29, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence Office
County: Maricopa
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Referring Judge: Edward C Voss (PS)
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Petitioner's re 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) is denied. The Clerk of Court shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/27/10. (KMG)
February 10, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Government's Motion to Continue. Evidentiary Hearing re-set for 4/20/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/10.(LSP)
January 27, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Accepting in part and Denying in part REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 21 . Evidentiary Hearing set for 2/23/2010 09:00 AM before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/27/10. (see order for details)(DMT)
November 24, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, Recommending that the 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) be denied; that Movant's request for an evidentiary hearing be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward C Voss on 11/23/09. (REW, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eljammal v. Humetewa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Moustapha Lotfi Eljammal
Represented By: Jason Mark Kalafat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Diane J. Humetewa
Represented By: Howard David Sukenic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael B. Mukasey
Represented By: Howard David Sukenic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?