Golden Scorpio Corp v. Steel Horse Saloon I et al

Plaintiff: Golden Scorpio Corp
Defendant: Steel Horse Saloon I, Steel Horse Bar & Grill, Whabah, Inc., Steel Horse Saloon II, Steel Horse Saloon III, Steel Horse Saloon IV, Steel Horse Pub & Grill, Steel-Horse.com, Steel Horse Grill and Saloon, The Steel Horse Saloon I, Western Trails Ranch, Steel Horse Saloon V and The Steel Horse Saloon II
Case Number: 2:2008cv01781
Filed: September 29, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Trademark Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 9, 2009 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Pla's 72 Motion for Default Judgment is DENIED.FURTHER ORDERED that Dft Steel Horse Saloon V is DISMISSED for failure to serve and lack of personal jurisdiction. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is directe d to mail a copy of this Order to Greg and Debbie Coble at 893 Cheney Ave., Marion, OH 43302. FURTHER ORDERED that Pla show cause as to why the Court should not dismiss Dfts Steel Horse Saloon III, Steel Horse Pub & Grill, and The Steel Horse Saloon I, pursuant to FRCivP 4(m) for failure to timely serve. Pla is directed to file a memorandum doing so by 4/17/09. Failure to respond will be considered as consent to the dismissal of these parties. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 4/9/09. (SAT)
March 26, 2009 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Pla show cause as to why the Court should not dismiss Dft Steel Horse Saloon V pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) or, alternatively, for lack of personal jurisdiction. FURTHER ORDERED sett ing the Order to Show Cause/Evidentiary Hearing for 4/2/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge G Murray Snow. Pla is directed to be prepared to present the evidentiary basis supporting service on and personal jurisdiction over Dft Steel Horse Saloon V. FURTHER ORDERED that Pla shall file a memorandum with the Court by 4/10/09, providing legal authority supporting: (1) the conclusion that service upon a business entity's owners in a stat e is sufficient to grant personal jurisdiction over the business entity itself; and (2) the conclusion that a business owner's contacts with a state may be imputed to the business when conducting a general jurisdiction analysis. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/26/09. (SAT)
February 11, 2009 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 49 Motion for Default Judgment. That defendants Steel Horse Saloon IV, Steel-Horse.com, Steel Horse Grill and Saloon, and The Steel Horse Saloon II are DISMISSED for lack of personal jurisdiction. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/11/09.(DMT, )
January 27, 2009 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Pla Show Cause as to why the Court should not dismiss Dfts Steel Horse Saloon IV, Steel-Horse.com, Steel Horse Grill and Saloon, and The Steel Horse Saloon II from the action for lack of personal jurisdiction. Plaintiff shall file a memorandum and the factual record supporting personal jurisdiction on or before 02/06/09. signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 01/27/09. (ESL)
January 23, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant Steel Horse Bar & Grill be severed from the present action pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 21. That Defendant Steel Horse Bar & Grill's Motion to Dismiss 25 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Motion to Strike 26 is DENIED. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/23/09.(DMT, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golden Scorpio Corp v. Steel Horse Saloon I et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden Scorpio Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steel Horse Saloon I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steel Horse Bar & Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whabah, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steel Horse Saloon II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steel Horse Saloon III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steel Horse Saloon IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steel Horse Pub & Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steel-Horse.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steel Horse Grill and Saloon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Steel Horse Saloon I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Trails Ranch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steel Horse Saloon V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Steel Horse Saloon II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?