In re: Medicis Pharmaceutical Corp. Securities Litigation
Plaintiff: Local 449 Steamfitters Pension Fund, Darlene Oliver, Andrew Hall and Steven Rand
Defendant: Medicis Pharmaceutical Corporation, Jonah Shacknai, Ernst & Young LLP, Richard D Peterson and Mark A Prygocki, Sr.
Case Number: 2:2008cv01821
Filed: October 3, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER, the Class Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order for Final Distribution of the Net Settlement Fund #170 is granted; the Claims Administrator to be paid the additional sum of $56,208.14 from the Net Settlement Fund for the balance of its fees and expenses incurred in connection with the services performed in giving Class Notice, preparing tax returns for the Settlement Fund, processing the Proofs of Claim, and administering and distributing the balance of the Settlement Fund and interest accrued thereon after deducting the payments previously allowed and set forth herein plus any taxes owed; $11,388.97, the residual balance of the Net Settlement Fund, to be donated to the Institute for Law and Economic Policy; this Court shall retain jurisdiction over any further application or matter that may arise in connection with this action. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/7/15. (REW)
April 15, 2015 Filing 172 *DECLARATION of Stephen J. Cirami re: #170 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds, #171 Memorandum by Plaintiffs Darlene Oliver, Steven Rand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lieberman, Jeremy) *Modified on 4/16/2015; document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)* (REW).
April 15, 2015 Filing 171 MEMORANDUM in Support of Class Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order for Final Distribution of The Net Settlement Fund #170 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds by Plaintiffs Darlene Oliver, Steven Rand. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
April 15, 2015 Filing 170 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds by Darlene Oliver, Steven Rand. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lieberman, Jeremy)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER FOR DISTRIBUTION, granting #161 Motion for Order of Distribution; this Court shall retain jurisdiction over any further application or matter that may arise in connection with this Action (see order for complete details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/7/13.(REW)
February 4, 2013 Filing 168 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #162 Affidavit part 13 by Plaintiffs Darlene Oliver, Steven Rand. (Attachments: #1 part 14)(Kroll, Jennifer)
February 4, 2013 Filing 167 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #162 Affidavit part 11 by Plaintiffs Darlene Oliver, Steven Rand. (Attachments: #1 part 12)(Kroll, Jennifer)
February 4, 2013 Filing 166 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #162 Affidavit part 9 by Plaintiffs Darlene Oliver, Steven Rand. (Attachments: #1 part 10)(Kroll, Jennifer)
February 4, 2013 Filing 165 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #162 Affidavit part 7 by Plaintiffs Darlene Oliver, Steven Rand. (Attachments: #1 part 8)(Kroll, Jennifer)
February 4, 2013 Filing 164 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #162 Affidavit by Plaintiffs Darlene Oliver, Steven Rand. (Attachments: #1 part 6)(Kroll, Jennifer)
February 4, 2013 Filing 163 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #162 Affidavit part 3 by Plaintiffs Darlene Oliver, Steven Rand. (Attachments: #1 part 4)(Kroll, Jennifer)
February 4, 2013 Filing 162 AFFIDAVIT of Jason Zuena re #161 MOTION for Order for Distribution of the Net Settlement Fund by Plaintiffs Darlene Oliver, Steven Rand. (Attachments: #1 part 2)(Kroll, Jennifer)
February 4, 2013 Filing 161 MOTION for Order for Distribution of the Net Settlement Fund by Darlene Oliver, Steven Rand. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroll, Jennifer)
August 6, 2012 Filing 160 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jeremy A Lieberman. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 159 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE the action and all Released Plaintiffs' Claims are dismissed with prejudice. The Parties are to bear their own costs, except as otherwise provided in the Settlement Stipulation or this Judgment. The provisions of this Judgment constitute a full and complete adjudication of the matters considered and adjudged herein, and the Court determines that there is no just reason for delay in the entry of this Judgment. The Clerk is hereby directed to immediately enter this Judgment. Lead Counsel are awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $4,500,000.00 and reimbursement of expenses, including experts' fees and expenses, in the amount of $580,877.52. Lead Plaintiff Steven Rand is awarded the sum of $20,000.00 and Class Representative Plaintiff Darlene Oliver is awarded the sum of $15,000.00, as reasonable costs and expenses (see attached pdf for complete information). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/27/12. (TLJ)
February 23, 2012 Filing 158 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge G Murray Snow. Appearances: Jeremy Lieberman, Patrick Dahlstrom and Susan Martin for plaintiffs. Robert Hubbell and Don Martin for defendant Ernst & Young, LLP. Lloyd Winawer, Joseph Adams and Joel Hoxie for defendant Medicis Pharmaceutical Corporation. Settlement Hearing held on 2/23/2012. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Gary Moll.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting #154 Defendants' Motion to Withdraw as Counsel, attorney Maureen Onyeagbako shall be permitted to withdraw. Her name shall be removed from the Courts docket as counsel of record. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/22/12.(LSP)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 156 IT IS ORDERED the Settlement Hearing presently set for 2/23/12 at 9:00 a.m. is RESET AS TO TIME ONLY!!. Settlement Hearing set for 2/23/12 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge G Murray Snow. Ordered by Judge G Murray Snow.(ADG)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)
February 17, 2012 Filing 155 *MEMORANDUM (Supplemental Memorandum) in Support of Final Approval of Settlement, Plan of Allocation, Award of Attorneys Fees and Expenses, and Compensatory Awards For Class Plaintiffs #150 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses, and Class Plaintiff Compensatory Awards, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #142 MOTION in Support of Final Approval of Proposed Settlement and Plan of Allocation and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Plaintiff Steven Rand and Darlene Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Affidavit of Jose C. Fraga)(Lieberman, Jeremy) *Modified to add filer Darlene Oliver on 2/21/2012 (TLJ).
January 27, 2012 Filing 154 MOTION to Withdraw by Medicis Pharmaceutical Corporation, Richard D Peterson, Mark A Prygocki, Sr, Jonah Shacknai. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Joseph)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting #152 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages re #142 Motion for Final Approval of the Proposed Settlement and #150 Motion for Attorney Fees. See PDF document for details. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/27/12.(LSP)
January 20, 2012 Filing 152 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Settlement and Plan of Allocation and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Doc. 142) and Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Expenses, and Class Plaintiff Compensatory Awards, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Doc. 150) by Darlene Oliver, Steven Rand. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroll, Jennifer)
January 20, 2012 Filing 151 ERRATA re #149 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses, and Class Plaintiff Compensatory Awards, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #144 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses, and Class Plaintiff Compensatory Awards, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Plaintiffs Darlene Oliver, Steven Rand. (Kroll, Jennifer)
January 20, 2012 Filing 150 AMENDED MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses, and Class Plaintiff Compensatory Awards, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Darlene Oliver, Steven Rand. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lieberman, Jeremy)
January 19, 2012 Filing 149 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses, and Class Plaintiff Compensatory Awards, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Darlene Oliver, Steven Rand. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lieberman, Jeremy)
January 19, 2012 Filing 148 DECLARATION of Darlene Oliver in Support of Class Action Settlement and Related Matters re #144 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses, and Class Plaintiff Compensatory Awards, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Plaintiffs Darlene Oliver, Steven Rand. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
January 19, 2012 Filing 147 DECLARATION of Steve Rand in Support of Class Action Settlement and Related Matters re #144 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses, and Class Plaintiff Compensatory Awards, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Plaintiffs Darlene Oliver, Steven Rand. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
January 19, 2012 Filing 146 DECLARATION of Susan Martin in Support of Application for Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses re #144 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses, and Class Plaintiff Compensatory Awards, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Plaintiffs Darlene Oliver, Steven Rand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lieberman, Jeremy)
January 19, 2012 Filing 145 DECLARATION of Jeremy A. Lieberman in Support of Application for Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses re #144 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses, and Class Plaintiff Compensatory Awards, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Plaintiffs Darlene Oliver, Steven Rand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lieberman, Jeremy)
January 19, 2012 Filing 144 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses, and Class Plaintiff Compensatory Awards, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Darlene Oliver, Steven Rand. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
January 19, 2012 Filing 143 DECLARATION of Jeremy A. Lieberman in Support of Final Approval of Settlement, Plan of Allocation, Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses, and Compensatory Awards for Class Plaintiffs re #142 MOTION in Support of Final Approval of Proposed Settlement and Plan of Allocation and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Plaintiffs Darlene Oliver, Steven Rand. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Affidavit, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Lieberman, Jeremy)
January 19, 2012 Filing 142 MOTION in Support of Final Approval of Proposed Settlement and Plan of Allocation and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Darlene Oliver, Steven Rand. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting Preliminary Approval to Settlement and Directing Dissemination of Notice to the Class. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED as follows: The provisions of the Settlement Stipulation, including definitions of the terms used therein, are hereby incorporated by reference as though fully set forth herein. A Settlement Hearing will be held by this Court in the courtroom of the Honorable G. Murray Snow, United States District Court, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, Arizona 85003 on 02/23/12 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/02/11. (NOTE: See attached pdf for complete details) (ESL)
November 2, 2011 Filing 140 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge G Murray Snow. Appearances: Jeremy Lieberman and Susan Martin for plaintiffs. Robert Hubbell and Nicole Stanton for defendants Ernst & Young, LLP. Lloyd Winawer and Joel Hoxie for defendants Shacknai, Peterson and Prygocki, Sr., and Medicis Pharmaceutical Corporation. Motion Hearing held on 11/2/2011. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Gary Moll.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 139 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED setting oral argument for #138 MOTION for and Memorandum in Support of Preliminary Approval of Settlement and Certification of Settlement Class re #137 Stipulation. Motion Hearing set for 11/2/2011 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge G Murray Snow. Ordered by Judge G Murray Snow.(ADG)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)
September 21, 2011 Filing 138 MOTION for and Memorandum in Support of Preliminary Approval of Settlement and Certification of Settlement Class re #137 Stipulation, by Steven Rand. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
September 21, 2011 Filing 137 STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT by Steven Rand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Proposed Preliminary Approval Order, #2 Exhibit A-1. Notice, #3 Exhibit A-2. Proof of Claim, #4 Exhibit A-3. Summary Notice, #5 Exhibit B. Proposed Final Judgment)(Lieberman, Jeremy)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER Pursuant to the parties' #135 Stipulation to Extend Time, it is hereby ordered that the time for parties to submit their stipulation of settlement for preliminary approval is extended up to and through 09/21/11. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 09/15/11. (ESL)
September 15, 2011 Filing 135 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Submit the Stipulation of Settlement by Medicis Pharmaceutical Corporation, Richard D Peterson, Mark A Prygocki, Sr, Jonah Shacknai. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Joseph)
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER that all pending matters are stayed until further order of the Court and that the parties shall have through and including 09/16/11 to submit a settlement agreement for preliminary approval. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 07/20/11. (ESL)
July 19, 2011 Filing 133 NOTICE of Settlement and Request to Stay Pending Matters by Steven Rand (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroll, Jennifer)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER pursuant to #131 Stipulation: Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearing as to #114 MOTION to Certify Class: Plaintiffs to file their reply in support of motion for class certification on or before 5/23/2011. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 4/28/2011. (NVO)
April 22, 2011 Filing 131 STIPULATION to Extend Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Medicis Pharmaceutical Corporation, Richard D Peterson, Mark A Prygocki, Sr, Jonah Shacknai. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Joseph)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting #129 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
March 15, 2011 Filing 129 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Dennis Orr on behalf of Ernst & Young LLP. (BAS)
March 15, 2011 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX107610 as to Dennis Orr. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 10, 2011 Filing 128 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Nicole France Stanton (Stanton, Nicole)
March 10, 2011 Filing 127 NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert B Hubbell (Hubbell, Robert)
March 10, 2011 Filing 126 Joinder re #125 Response in Opposition to Motion by Defendant Ernst & Young LLP. (Stanton, Nicole)
March 8, 2011 Filing 125 RESPONSE in Opposition re #114 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Medicis Pharmaceutical Corporation, Richard D Peterson, Mark A Prygocki, Sr, Jonah Shacknai. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hoxie, Joel)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER pursuant to the parties' #123 Stipulation, it is hereby ordered Plas' #114 Motion for Class Certification is amended to state that it is seeking certification of the following class (see attached pdf). Dfts shall file any response in opposition to Plas' #114 Motion for Class Certification as amended no later than 03/08/11. If the Motion for Class Certification is opposed by Dfts, Plas shall file their Reply in support of the Motion for Class Certification no later than 04/22/11. The deadlines in the Case Management Order (Doc. 108) shall remain unchanged. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 02/23/11. (ESL)
February 18, 2011 Filing 123 STIPULATION Request to Amend Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Extend Briefing Schedule for Motion by Medicis Pharmaceutical Corporation, Richard D Peterson, Mark A Prygocki, Sr, Jonah Shacknai. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Joseph)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER. This afternoon the Court held a telephonic conference with the parties regarding the scope of permissible discovery concerning the claims in this suit. The request related more to the permissible scope of discovery rather than to disputes regarding specific requests. The Court did not rule on specific discovery requests, nor does it preclude subsequent objections based on specific requests. Nevertheless, as it relates to discovery on Plaintiffs claims against Medicis the Court ruled that Plaintiffs may reasonably seek discovery as to its allegations pertaining to the manipulation of revenue by Medicis including, for example, the acceleration or deferral of revenue realization, channel stuffing, product return and exchange and accounting for reserves, and that it may reasonably seek such information back to January 1, 2000. As it pertains to the discovery sought against EY concerning its accounting for sales return reserves, the Court will allow reasonable discovery of such matters to the extent that the Plaintiffs request is reasonably tailored to EY's pharmaceutical clients with similar policies for reasonable periods. Further considerations include appropriate protection of the clients identities and their business confidential information. Depending upon the extent to which identifying material is sought, further consideration will be given to providing notification to the client to permit the client to assert any applicable argument or privilege. As it pertains to the scope of the privilege provided in Section 105(b)(5)(A) of the Sarbanes-Oxley Act, both Plaintiff and EY will simultaneously submit their positions in memoranda not to exceed eight pages and to be filed with the Court not later than February 17, 2011. Signed by Judge G. Murray Snow on February 3, 2011. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (GMS)
January 20, 2011 Filing 121 NOTICE re Service by Medicis Pharmaceutical Corporation, Richard D Peterson, Mark A Prygocki, Sr, Jonah Shacknai. (Adams, Joseph)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting #118 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #119 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
January 20, 2011 Filing 119 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Anna Hsia on behalf of Medicis Pharmaceutical Corporation. (BAS)
January 20, 2011 Filing 118 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Maureen C Onyeagbako on behalf of Medicis Pharmaceutical Corporation. (BAS)
January 20, 2011 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX105600 as to Maureen C Onyeagbako. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
January 20, 2011 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX105601 as to Anna Hsia. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting #116 Stipulation as to #114 MOTION to Certify Class: Defendants shall file any Response in opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion forClass Certification (Doc. 114) no later than February 22, 2011. If the Motion for Class Certification is opposed by Defendants, Plaintiffs shall file their Reply in support of the Motion for Class Certification no later than April 8,2011. The deadlines in the Case Management Order (Doc. 108) shall remainunchanged. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/6/11. (LAD)
January 5, 2011 Filing 116 STIPULATION by Medicis Pharmaceutical Corporation, Richard D Peterson, Mark A Prygocki, Sr, Jonah Shacknai. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoxie, Joel)
December 17, 2010 Filing 115 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #114 MOTION to Certify Class (Text of Proposed Order) by Plaintiffs Darlene Oliver, Steven Rand. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
December 17, 2010 Filing 114 MOTION to Certify Class by Darlene Oliver, Steven Rand. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard C. May, #2 Attachment A, #3 Attachment B, #4 Attachment C, #5 Attachment D, #6 Attachment E)(Lieberman, Jeremy)
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #112 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; directing the Clerk of the Court to remove from the docket attorneys Timothy W. Brown, Phillip Kim and Laurence Rosen of The Rosen Law Firm, P.A. and Richard G. Himelrick and Jeremy James Christian of Tiffany & Bosco, P.A., as counsel of record for Plaintiff Andrew Hall. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 12/07/10. (ESL)
November 16, 2010 Filing 112 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Andrew Hall. (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT A - DECLARATION OF J. JAMES CHRISTIAN, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Christian, Jeremy)
November 9, 2010 Filing 111 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Medicis Pharmaceutical Corporation, Richard D Peterson, Mark A Prygocki, Sr, Jonah Shacknai for proceedings held on 11/4/2010 before Judge GMA.. (Adams, Joseph)
November 8, 2010 Filing 110 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Scheduling Conference Proceedings held on 11/04/2010, before Judge G Murray Snow. Court Reporter Gary Moll. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/29/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/9/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/7/2011. (BAS)
November 5, 2010 Filing 109 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Andrew Hall for proceedings held on 11/4/2010 before Judge G. Murray Snow.. (Dahlstrom, Patrick)
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 108 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Discovery due by 8/1/2011. Dispositive motions due by 12/1/2011. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/05/10. (NOTE: see attached pdf for complete details)(ESL)
November 4, 2010 Filing 107 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge G Murray Snow. Appearances: Patrick Dahlstrom and Jeremy Lieberman for plaintiffs. Robert Hubbell and Don Martin for defendants Ernst & Young, LLP. Lloyd Winawer, Joseph Adams and Joel Hoxie for defendants Shacknai, Peterson and Prygocki, Sr., and Medicis Pharmaceutical Corporation. Scheduling Conference held on 11/4/2010. Status of the case is discussed and case management deadlines are established. The Court signs the Case Management Order this date. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Gary Moll.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ)
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting #105 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
October 28, 2010 Filing 105 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Robert J Hodgson on behalf of Andrew Hall. (BAS)
October 28, 2010 Filing 104 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Plaintiffs Darlene Oliver, Steven Rand. (Lieberman, Jeremy) CORRECTION: incorrect event selected; document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c). Modified on 10/29/2010 (ESL).
October 28, 2010 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX102910 as to Robert J Hodgson. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 19, 2010 Filing 103 NOTICE re Service of Initial Disclosures by Plaintiffs by Darlene Oliver, Steven Rand. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
October 19, 2010 Filing 102 NOTICE re Service of Defendant Ernst & Young LLP's Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosure Statement by Ernst & Young LLP. (Stanton, Nicole)
October 18, 2010 Filing 101 NOTICE re Service of Initial Disclosures by Medicis Pharmaceutical Corporation, Richard D Peterson, Mark A Prygocki, Sr, Jonah Shacknai. (Adams, Joseph)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Due to a conflict, IT IS ORDERED the Scheduling Conference, presently set for 10/29/2010 at 3:30 p.m. is VACATED and RESET. Scheduling Conference set for 11/4/2010 at 4:30 p.m. in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge G Murray Snow. Ordered by Judge G Murray Snow. (ADG)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Case Management Conference is set for 10/29/10 at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 602, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Federal Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona 85003-2151. The Court directs counsel to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 for the objectives of the Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 09/20/10. (note: see attached pdf for complete details).(ESL)
September 17, 2010 Filing 98 ANSWER to #76 Amended Complaint, by Medicis Pharmaceutical Corporation, Richard D Peterson, Mark A Prygocki, Sr, Jonah Shacknai.(Winawer, Lloyd)
September 17, 2010 Filing 97 ANSWER to #76 Amended Complaint, (Second) by Ernst & Young LLP.(Stine, Lauren)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED granting the parties' #95 Stipulation and Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the Second Amended Class Action Complaint ("SAC"), and extending the time for Dfts to Answer the SAC, to and including, 9/17/2010. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 9/10/10. (SAT)
September 9, 2010 Filing 95 STIPULATION and Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Second Amended Class Action Complaint (Second Request) by Ernst & Young LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stine, Lauren)
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting the parties' #93 Stipulation and Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the Second Amended Class Action Complaint and extending the time for Defendants to Answer the SAC until and including 09/10/10. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 08/20/10. (ESL)
August 19, 2010 Filing 93 STIPULATION and Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Second Amended Class Action Complaint by Ernst & Young LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stine, Lauren)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER that Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Doc. #80 , #81 ) are DENIED. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 08/09/10. (ESL)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #90 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and allowing attorneys Blake E. Williams and John D. Cooke to withdraw as counsel of record for Defendants Medicis Pharmaceutical Corp., Richard D. Peterson, and Jonah Shacknai. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/3/10. (LAD)
April 27, 2010 Filing 90 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Blake E. Williams and John D. Cooke by Medicis Pharmaceutical Corporation, Richard D Peterson, Jonah Shacknai. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Lloyd Winawer, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Winawer, Lloyd)
April 14, 2010 Filing 89 REPLY in Support re #81 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Medicis Pharmaceutical Corporation, Richard D Peterson, Mark A Prygocki, Sr, Jonah Shacknai. (Winawer, Lloyd)
April 14, 2010 Filing 88 REPLY to Response to Motion re #80 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Ernst & Young. (Stanton, Nicole)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER pursuant to the parties' #86 Stipulated Request for Two Day Extension, the deadline for Defendants to file Reply briefs in support of Motions to Dismiss (Dkt. # #80 , #81 ) is extended by two days, to and including, April 14, 2010. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 04/09/10. (ESL)
April 9, 2010 Filing 86 STIPULATION Two Day Extension to File Reply by Medicis Pharmaceutical Corporation, Richard D Peterson, Mark A Prygocki, Sr, Jonah Shacknai. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Joseph)
March 24, 2010 Filing 85 RESPONSE (Memorandum of Points and Authories) in Opposition Dfts re #80 MOTION to Dismiss Case, #81 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Steven Rand. (KMG)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER that Plaintiffs Motion #82 is granted and directing the Clerk of the Court to file the lodged proposed Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendants Medicis Pharmaceutical Corporation and Ernst & Young's Motions to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint (Dkt. # 83). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/24/10.(KMG)
March 22, 2010 Filing 83 LODGED Proposed Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendants Medicis Pharmaceutical Corporation and Ernst & Young's Motions to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint re: #82 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendants Medicis Pharmaceutical Corporation and Ernst & Young's Motions to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Steven Rand. (Kroll, Jennifer)
March 22, 2010 Filing 82 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendants Medicis Pharmaceutical Corporation and Ernst & Young's Motions to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint by Steven Rand. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroll, Jennifer)
February 19, 2010 Filing 81 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Medicis Pharmaceutical Corp., Richard D Peterson, Mark A Prygocki, Sr, Jonah Shacknai. (Winawer, Lloyd)
February 19, 2010 Filing 80 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Ernst & Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(Stanton, Nicole)
February 19, 2010 Filing 79 Notice re Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Ernst & Young LLP's Reply to Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint by Ernst & Young (Stanton, Nicole)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the #77 Stipulated Request to Modify Schedule is granted as follows: 1. Dfts' shall file motions to dismiss or other response to the SAC on or before 2/19/2010. 2. Lead Pla shall file his opposition to any motions to dismiss the SAC on or before 3/22/2010. 3. Any reply papers in support of any motion to dismiss shall be filed by any Dft on or before 4/12/2010. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/16/10. (SAT)
February 16, 2010 Filing 77 STIPULATION Request to Modify Schedule by Medicis Pharmaceutical Corp., Richard D Peterson, Mark A Prygocki, Sr, Jonah Shacknai. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Joseph)
January 20, 2010 Filing 76 AMENDED COMPLAINT /CORRECTED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ernst & Young, Medicis Pharmaceutical Corp., Richard D Peterson, Mark A Prygocki, Sr, Jonah Shacknai;Jury Demand, filed by Steven Rand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Corrected redline indicating changes from Amended Complaint and Second Amended Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Conversion Table indicating paragraphs that have been renumbered))(Kroll, Jennifer)
January 20, 2010 Filing 75 ERRATA by Steven Rand re #74 Amended Complaint, / Second Amended Complaint. (Kroll, Jennifer) Modified on 1/21/2010 (TLJ). INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED. ENTRY MODIFIED FROM NOTICE TO ERRATA.
January 18, 2010 Filing 74 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against Ernst & Young, Medicis Pharmaceutical Corp., Richard D Peterson, Mark A Prygocki, Sr, Jonah Shacknai;Jury Demand, filed by Steven Rand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (redline indicating changes from Amended Complaint and Second Amended Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Conversion Table indicating paragraphs that have been renumbered))(Kroll, Jennifer)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting the #72 Stipulation: Lead Pla shall file the Second Amended Complaint ("SAC") on or before January 18, 2010; Dfts shall respond to the SAC on or before February 17, 2010; If any Dft files a motion to dismiss the SAC, Lead Pla shall file his opposition to such motion on or before March 19, 2010. Any reply papers in support of any motion to dismiss Lead Pla's SAC shall be filed by any Dft on or before April 9, 2010. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/4/10. (KMG, )
December 23, 2009 Filing 72 STIPULATION REGARDING FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE (FIRST REQUEST) by Steven Rand. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroll, Jennifer)
December 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #56 Ernst and Young's Motion to Dismiss Case; granting #58 the Medicis Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Case. ORDER that Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint #53 is dismissed with leave to file a Second Amended Complaint on or before 1/4/10. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 12/1/09.(TLJ)
October 15, 2009 Filing 70 REPLY in Support re #58 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Medicis Pharmaceutical Corp., Richard D Peterson, Mark A Prygocki, Sr, Jonah Shacknai. (Winawer, Lloyd)
October 15, 2009 Filing 69 Notice re Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Ernst & Young LLP's Reply to Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action Complaint by Ernst & Young (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Stanton, Nicole)
October 15, 2009 Filing 68 REPLY to Response to Motion re #56 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Ernst & Young. (Stanton, Nicole)
September 9, 2009 Filing 67 RESPONSE in Opposition re #58 MOTION to Dismiss Case, #56 MOTION to Dismiss Case / PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MEDICIS PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION'S AND ERNST & YOUNG'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS filed by Steven Rand. (Martin, Susan)
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #61 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and directing that Lead Plaintiff file the lodged combined opposition to Ernst & Young LLP's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action Complaint #56 and to Medicis Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action Complaint #58 not to exceed 27 pages. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 9/4/09.(DMT, )
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting #63 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #64 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
September 1, 2009 Filing 64 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Robert B Hubbell on behalf of Ernst & Young. (BAS)
September 1, 2009 Filing 63 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Alexander K Mircheff on behalf of Ernst & Young. (BAS)
September 1, 2009 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX088063 as to Alexander K Mircheff. (BAS)
September 1, 2009 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX088062 as to Robert B Hubbell. (BAS)
August 31, 2009 Filing 62 LODGED Proposed Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendant Medicis Pharmaceutical Corporation's and Ernst & Young's Motions to Dismiss re: #61 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendant Medicis Pharmaceutical Corporation's and Ernst & Young's Motions to Dismiss. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Steven Rand. (Martin, Susan)
August 31, 2009 Filing 61 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendant Medicis Pharmaceutical Corporation's and Ernst & Young's Motions to Dismiss by Steven Rand. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Lodged Proposed Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendant Medicis Pharmaceutical Corporation's and Ernst & Young's Motions to Dismiss)(Martin, Susan)
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting the Parties' #55 Stipulation as follows: Ernst & Young is subject to the briefing schedule set forth in the Stipulation Regarding Consolidated Amended Complaint and Scheduling (First Request) filed 03/23/09; and Quarles & Brady LLP hereby agrees to accept service on behalf of Defendant Ernst & Young LLP. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 07/27/09. (ESL)
July 17, 2009 Filing 59 REQUEST re: Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Federal Securities Class Action Complaint by Defendants Medicis Pharmaceutical Corp., Jonah Shacknai, Richard D Peterson, Mark A Prygocki, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(Winawer, Lloyd)
July 17, 2009 Filing 58 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Medicis Pharmaceutical Corp., Jonah Shacknai, Richard D Peterson, Mark A Prygocki, Sr. (Winawer, Lloyd)
July 17, 2009 Filing 57 REQUEST for Judicial Notice in Support of Ernst & Young LLP's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action Comlaint by Ernst & Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Stanton, Nicole) Modified on 7/29/2009 INCORRECT DOCUMENT EVENT SELECTED; THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM (Motion) TO (Request) (REW, ).
July 17, 2009 Filing 56 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Ernst & Young. (Stanton, Nicole)
July 17, 2009 Filing 55 STIPULATION Regarding Scheduling and Service of Process (First Request) by Ernst & Young. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stanton, Nicole)
July 16, 2009 Filing 54 Summons Issued as to Ernst & Young. (MHA). *** IMPORTANT: You must select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" on the print screen in order for the court seal to appear on the summons you print.
May 18, 2009 Filing 53 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ernst & Young, Medicis Pharmaceutical Corp., Jonah Shacknai, Richard D Peterson, Mark A Prygocki, Sr;Jury Demand, filed by Steven Rand. (Attachments: #1 Summons Ernst & Young)(Martin, Susan) Modified on 5/19/2009 (SAT). DOCKET MODIFIED TO ADD Defendant Ernst & Young TO THE CASE.
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER The Parties Joint Stipulated Motion for Extenstion of Time #51 for Filing Amended Complaint, Response and Amended Complaint and Related Deadlines is hereby denied. The current deadlines remain in place. Ordered by Judge G Murray Snow on May 15, 2009. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (GMS, ) Modified on 5/18/2009 (TLJ). DOCKET TEXT MODIFIED TO REFLECT DOCUMENT LINKAGE TO #51 .
May 13, 2009 Filing 51 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR FILING AMENDED COMPLAINT, RESPONSE TO AMENDED COMPLAINT AND RELATED DEADLINES by Steven Rand. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroll, Jennifer)
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting Pla's #48 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Directing the Clerk of the Court to remove from the docket attorneys Darren J. Robbins, John J. Rice, Matthew P. Montgomery, Ramzi Abadou, and Erik D. Peterson of Coughlin Stoia Geller Rudman & Robbins LLP as counsel of record for Pla Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Fund. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 04/14/09. (ESL)
March 26, 2009 Filing 49 DECLARATION of of Erik D. Peterson in Support re #48 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Movant Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Fund. (Peterson, Erik)
March 26, 2009 Filing 48 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Erik)
March 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER pursuant to #46 Stipulation; Lead Plaintiff shall file a Consolidated Amended Complaint (CAC) on or before 5/18/09; Defendants named in the complaints currently on file in the consolidated actions shall not be required to respond to any of such complaints and instead shall respond to the CAC on or before 7/17/09 (see for for further details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/26/09. (REW, )
March 23, 2009 Filing 46 STIPULATION REGARDING CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SCHEDULING (FIRST REQUEST) by Medicis Pharmaceutical Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING)(Winawer, Lloyd)
March 11, 2009 Filing 45 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Fund. (Peterson, Erik)
March 11, 2009 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Lynn Kroll on behalf of Steven Rand (Kroll, Jennifer)
March 11, 2009 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance OF Susan Martin by Jennifer Lynn Kroll on behalf of Steven Rand (Kroll, Jennifer) Modified on 3/12/2009, DOCKET TEXT MODIFIED TO INCLUDE ATTORNEY ADDED, (LSP).
March 11, 2009 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance of Jeremy A Lieberman by Jennifer Lynn Kroll on behalf of Steven Rand (Kroll, Jennifer) Modified on 3/12/2009, DOCKET TEXT MODIFIED TO INCLUDE ATTORNEY ADDED, (LSP).
March 11, 2009 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance of Patrick Dahlstrom by Jennifer Lynn Kroll on behalf of Steven Rand (Kroll, Jennifer) Modified on 3/12/2009, DOCKET TEXT MODIFIED TO INCLUDE ATTORNEY ADDED, (LSP).
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 CONSOLIDATION ORDER - LEAD CASE that Steamfitters' motion to consolidate, appoint lead plaintiff, and appoint lead counsel #6 is granted with respect to consolidation and denied in all other respects. ORDER that Rand's motion to consolidate, appoint lead plaintiff, and appoint lead counsel #9 is granted. ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall consolidate the following three cases: CV 08-1821; CV 08-1870; and CV 08-1964. The cases will be consolidated before this Court under CV 08-1821-PHX-GMS (see order for details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/10/09. (TLJ)
March 9, 2009 Filing 39 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (BAS, )
March 9, 2009 Filing 38 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Motion Hearing held on 3/4/09 before Judge G Murray Snow. Court Reporter: Gary Moll. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/30/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/9/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/8/2009. (BAS, )
March 6, 2009 Filing 37 Reply re #34 Supplement to Correct Record by Movant Steven Rand. (Martin, Susan)
March 5, 2009 Filing 36 RESPONSE re #34 Supplement by Movant Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Fund. (Peterson, Erik)
March 5, 2009 Filing 35 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Fund for proceedings held on 03/04/09 before Judge Snow. (Friedman, Andrew)
March 4, 2009 Filing 34 SUPPLEMENT of Supplemental Authority by Movant Steven Rand. (Martin, Susan)
March 4, 2009 Filing 33 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge G Murray Snow. Appearances: Erik Peterson and Ramzi Abadou for Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Fund. Susan Martin and Patrick Dahlstrom for Steven Rand. John Cooke and Joel Hoxie for defendants. Motion Hearing held on 3/4/2009 re #6 Motion to Consolidate Cases; Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff, and Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Fund; and #9 Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by Andrew Hall. Argument presented. IT IS ORDERED taking the motions under advisement.(Court Reporter Gary Moll.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ)
March 3, 2009 Filing 32 RESPONSE re of Steven Rand to Steamfitters' #29 Notice of Supplemental Authority. (Lieberman, Jeremy) INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED, THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM MEMORANDUM to RESPONSE Modified on 3/4/2009 (ESL).
March 3, 2009 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Medicis Pharmaceutical Corp.. (Hoxie, Joel)
March 2, 2009 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT of Andrew Friedman in Support of Notice of Supplemental Authority re #29 Other Notice by Movant Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Fund filed by Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Friedman, Andrew) Modified on 3/3/2009 INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM DECLARATION TO AFFIDAVIT (ESL).
March 2, 2009 Filing 29 Notice re Supplemental Authority by Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Fund re #6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel (Friedman, Andrew)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting #27 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
February 27, 2009 Filing 27 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Patrick V Dahlstrom on behalf of Andrew Hall. (BAS, )
February 27, 2009 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX081626 as to Patrick V Dahlstrom. (BAS, )
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER - Upon the Court's own motion, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED vacating oral argument on the Motion to Consolidate Cases/Appoint Lead Plaintiff, and Motion to Appoint Counsel (dkt #6 and 9) currently scheduled for 2/27/09 at 2:00 p.m. and re-setting hearing for 3/4/2009 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge G Murray Snow as to #6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to Appoint Counsel and #9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Cnsl for Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Fund and Steven Rand will be allowed twenty (20) minutes each to present their arguments. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/23/09. (SAT)
February 20, 2009 Filing 25 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 15 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 3/9/2009 as to Medicis Pharmaceutical Corp., and Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Fund. (KFZ)
February 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER setting oral argument on #6 Motion to consolidate cases, appoint lead plaintiff and appoint lead counsel and #9 Motion to Appoint Counsel: Oral argument set for 2/27/2009 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge G Murray Snow. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 02/18/09. (ESL)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting #22 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
January 29, 2009 Filing 22 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jeremy A Lieberman on behalf of Andrew Hall. (BAS, )
January 29, 2009 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX080360 as to Jerermy A Lieberman. (BAS, )
January 2, 2009 Filing 21 REPLY in Support re #6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Fund. (Friedman, Andrew)
January 2, 2009 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF RAND'S MTN TO BE APPOINTED LEAD PLAINTIFF COUNSEL AND LIAISON COUNSEL filed by Andrew Hall. (Martin, Susan)
December 19, 2008 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF RAND'S MTN TO BE APPOINTED LEAD PLAINTIFF COUNSEL AND LIAISON COUNSEL filed by Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Fund. (Friedman, Andrew)
December 19, 2008 Filing 18 RESPONSE To Motion #6 Motion to appoint lead plaintiff, appoint counsel MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN RESPONSE TO COMPETING MOTIONS FOR APPOINTMENT OF LEAD PLAINTIFF COUNSEL AND LIAISON COUNSEL by Plaintiff Andrew Hall. (Martin, Susan) Modified on 12/22/2008 (DMT, ). DOCUMENT TEXT MODIFIED TO CORRECT DOCUMENT LINKAGE. INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM RESPONSE TO RESPONSE TO MOTION.
December 10, 2008 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Address by Susan Joan Martin (Martin, Susan)
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
December 5, 2008 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney John D Cooke on behalf of defendants Medicis Pharmaceutical Corp., Jonah Shacknai, Richard D Peterson, and Mark A Prygocki, Sr. (BAS, )
December 5, 2008 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Blake E Williams on behalf of defendants Medicis Pharmaceutical Corp., Jonah Shacknai, Richard D Peterson, and Mark A Prygocki, Sr. (BAS, )
December 5, 2008 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Brian E Pastuszenski on behalf of defendants Medicis Pharmaceutical Corp., Jonah Shacknai, Richard D Peterson, and Mark A Prygocki, Sr. (BAS, )
December 5, 2008 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Lloyd Winawer on behalf of defendants Medicis Pharmaceutical Corp., Jonah Shacknai, Richard D Peterson, and Mark A Prygocki, Sr. (BAS, )
December 5, 2008 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph G Adams on behalf of Medicis Pharmaceutical Corp., Jonah Shacknai, Richard D Peterson, Mark A Prygocki, Sr (Adams, Joseph)
December 5, 2008 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 400, receipt number PHX078591 as to John D Cooke, Brian E Pastuszenski, Blake E Williams, Lloyd Winawer. (BAS, )
December 2, 2008 Filing 10 DECLARATION of DECLARATION OF PATRICK V. DAHLSTROM IN SUPPORT OF RAND'S MTN TO BE APPOINTED LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF LEAD COUNSEL AND LIAISON COUNSEL by Plaintiff Andrew Hall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Martin, Susan)
December 2, 2008 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF RAND'S MTN TO BE APPOINTED LEAD PLAINTIFF COUNSEL AND LIAISON COUNSEL by Andrew Hall. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martin, Susan)
December 2, 2008 Filing 8 DECLARATION of of Andrew Friedman re #6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Movant Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Fund filed by Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Loss Chart, #3 Exhibit C - Certification, #4 Exhibit D - CSGRR Firm Resume, #5 Exhibit E - Bonnett Fairbourn Firm Resume)(Friedman, Andrew)
December 2, 2008 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM re #6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Movant Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Fund filed by Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Fund. (Friedman, Andrew) INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED, THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM BRIEF TO MEMORANDUM Modified on 12/3/2008 (ESL, ).
December 2, 2008 Filing 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Steamfitters Local 449 Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Friedman, Andrew)
November 19, 2008 Remark as to attorneys Timothy W Brown, Phillip Kim and Laurence Rosen of Rosen Law Firm PA 350 5th Ave Ste 5508 New York NY 10118 removed from database for noncompliance with admission requirements, party represented by other admitted counsel. (BAS, )
October 7, 2008 Filing 5 Minute Order Pursuant to Local Rule 3.8(a), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge G. Murray Snow. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 08-1821-PHX-GMS. (MAP)
October 6, 2008 Filing 4 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
October 6, 2008 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Medicis Pharmaceutical Corp., Jonah Shacknai, Richard D Peterson, Mark A Prygocki, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Mark A. Prygocki, #2 Medicis Pharmaceutical Corp., #3 Richard D. Peterson)(CMH, ). *** IMPORTANT: You must select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" on the print screen in order for the court seal to appear on the summons you print.
October 3, 2008 Filing 2 Magistrate Election Form Deadline (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Election Form)(CMH, )
October 3, 2008 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michelle H. Burns. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CIV 08-1821-PHX-MHB. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CMH, )
October 3, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 350.00, receipt number 09700000000002272549, filed by Andrew Hall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Prygocki Summons, #3 Summons Medicis Summons, #4 Summons Peterson Summons, #5 Summons Shacknai Summons, #6 Exhibit Plaintiff's Certification)(Christian, Jeremy) DOCKET TEXT MODIFIED TO REFLECT THE CORRECT FILER. Modified on 10/3/2008 (CMH, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Medicis Pharmaceutical Corp. Securities Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medicis Pharmaceutical Corporation
Represented By: John D Cooke
Represented By: Anna Hsia,
Represented By: Joseph G Adams
Represented By: Lloyd Winawer
Represented By: Blake E Williams
Represented By: Brian E Pastuszenski
Represented By: Maureen C Onyeagbako,
Represented By: Joel Philip Hoxie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonah Shacknai
Represented By: John D Cooke
Represented By: Joseph G Adams
Represented By: Lloyd Winawer
Represented By: Blake E Williams
Represented By: Brian E Pastuszenski
Represented By: Joel Philip Hoxie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernst & Young LLP
Represented By: Alexander K Mircheff
Represented By: Nicole France Stanton
Represented By: Robert B Hubbell
Represented By: Dennis Orr,
Represented By: Lauren Elliott Stine
Represented By: Don P Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard D Peterson
Represented By: John D Cooke
Represented By: Joseph G Adams
Represented By: Lloyd Winawer
Represented By: Blake E Williams
Represented By: Brian E Pastuszenski
Represented By: Joel Philip Hoxie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A Prygocki, Sr.
Represented By: John D Cooke
Represented By: Joseph G Adams
Represented By: Lloyd Winawer
Represented By: Blake E Williams
Represented By: Brian E Pastuszenski
Represented By: Joel Philip Hoxie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 449 Steamfitters Pension Fund
Represented By: Matthew P Montgomery
Represented By: Andrew S Friedman
Represented By: Ramzi Abadou
Represented By: Erik Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Oliver
Represented By: Susan Joan Martin
Represented By: Jeremy A Lieberman
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Kroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Hall
Represented By: Richard Glenn Himelrick
Represented By: Susan Joan Martin
Represented By: James St Pierre Christian
Represented By: Patrick V Dahlstrom
Represented By: Robert J Hodgson
Represented By: Jeremy A Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Rand
Represented By: Susan Joan Martin
Represented By: Patrick V Dahlstrom
Represented By: Jeremy A Lieberman
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Kroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?