Hussein v. Schriro et al

Petitioner: Abo Obaida Hussein
Respondent: Dora B. Schriro and Arizona Attorney General, State of
Case Number: 2:2008cv01839
Filed: October 6, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Mark E Aspey (PS)
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The Magistrate Judge's 28 Report and Recommendation is accepted. The 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is denied. Petitioner's 26 Motion for Discovery and 32 Motion for New Trial are denied. The Clerk is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/21/10. (SAT)
November 19, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Petitioner's 29 Motion for starrs. Directing the Clerk to mail Petitioner an additional copy of the 28 R&R. Petitioner shall have until 12/11/09 to file an objection to the report and recommendation filed by Magistrate Judge Mark Aspey. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/18/09.(ESL)
October 27, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - IT IS RECOMMENDED that Mr Hussein's 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be denied and dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark E Aspey on 10/26/09. (SAT)
February 17, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Petitioner's 7 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Petitioner's 11 Request/Motion in his pleading entitled "Requests Pending Review Petitioner Case" is denied without prejudice. The Clerk of Court must serve a copy of the 1 Petition and this Order on the Respondent and the Attorney General of the State of Arizona by certified mail. Respondents must answer the Petition within 40 days of the date of service. Petitioner may file a reply within 30 days from the date of service of the answer. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Mark E. Aspey for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 02/17/09. (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hussein v. Schriro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Abo Obaida Hussein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dora B. Schriro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Arizona Attorney General, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?