Guth v. Best Western Hotel

Plaintiff: Paula Guth
Defendant: Best Western Hotel
Case Number: 2:2008cv01909
Filed: October 17, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2010 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants' 73 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted in part and denied in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of the Court terminate Bakul Mehta and Bavana Mehta as parties in this matter. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/9/10. (DTN)
November 6, 2008 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that Plaintiff show cause in writing on or before 11/14/08 why Plaintiff and/or her counsel should not be sanctioned pursuant to Title 18 U.S.C. 401, 28 U.S.C. 636(e) and/or the Courts inherent authority for failing to comply with the Courts prior order. If Plaintiff complies with the Courts 10/22/2008 Order on or before 5:00 p.m. on 11/14/08 or if Plaintiff has already done so but her consent or election has not yet been docketed by the Clerk, the undersigned will automatically discharge and vacate this OSC without imposing any sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 11/5/08. (MAP)
October 22, 2008 5 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT AND ORDER, that Plaintiff shall file her written election to either consent to magistrate-judge jurisdiction or elect to proceed before a United States district judge on or before Monday, November 3, 2008. That Defendant shall f ile its written election to either consent to magistrate-judge jurisdiction or elect to have this case assigned to a United States district judge within 20 days of its appearance herein or as otherwise directed by the Court. (see order for full details) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 10/21/08. (DMT, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guth v. Best Western Hotel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Guth
Represented By: Rosemary Stathakis Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Western Hotel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?