Med 4 Home, Inc. v. Geriatric Services of America, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Med 4 Home Incorporated
Defendant: E-Health Solve Incorporated and Geriatric Services of America Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2008cv01912
Filed: October 17, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2008. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2008 Remark as to attorney Robert J Keating of Howard O Bernstein PC 1111 Pearl St Ste 203 Boulder CO 80302 removed from database per attorney request; party represented by other admitted counsel. (BAS, )
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #9 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court; this case is remanded to Maricopa County Superior Court; Plaintiff's alternative request to abstain is denied as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED #17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and the Motion to Compel and the Motion for Preliminary Injunction, remain pending before the Superior Court. The Court will not give expedited consideration to Plaintiff's request for fees, costs and expenses and to the extent such request is currently pendning it is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 11/12/08. (Attachments: #(1) Remand Letter)(LSP)
November 12, 2008 Filing 29 REPLY in Support re #17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by E-Health Solve, Inc.. (Collins, Gregory)
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting #26 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #27 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
November 12, 2008 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 100, receipt number PHX077576 as to Howard O Bernstein. (BAS, )
November 12, 2008 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 100, receipt number PHX077575 as to Jennifer L Lorenz. (BAS, )
November 11, 2008 Filing 25 REPLY in Support re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE ABSTAIN filed by Med 4 Home, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 and 2)(Messing, Jeffrey)
November 10, 2008 Filing 27 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Howard O Bernstein on behalf of defendant E-Health Solve, Inc. (BAS, )
November 10, 2008 Filing 26 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jennifer L Lorenz on behalf of defendant E-Health Solve, Inc. (BAS, )
November 7, 2008 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and Request for Expedited Briefing and Ruling by Defendant E-Health Solve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Response to Motion to Compel)(Gordon, Andrew)
November 5, 2008 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE ABSTAIN filed by E-Health Solve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Response)(Gordon, Andrew) Modified on 11/6/2008, DOCUMENT NOT IN COMPLIANCE WITH LRCiv 7.1(c). ATTORNEY NOTICED, (LSP).
November 3, 2008 Filing 22 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
October 31, 2008 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint by E-Health Solve, Inc..(Gordon, Andrew) Modified on 11/3/2008, DOCUMENT NOT IN COMPLIANCE WITH LRCiv 7.1(c). ATTORNEY NOTICED, (LSP).
October 31, 2008 Filing 20 Notice re Notice of Filing Superior Court Discovery Orders and Minute Entries by Med 4 Home, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 09-16-2008 Order Expediting Discovery, #2 Exhibit 09-16-2008 Minute Entry, #3 Exhibit 09-30-08 Minute Entry, #4 Exhibit 12-02-2008 Minute Entry, #5 Exhibit 10-02-2008 Order)(Messing, Jeffrey)
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER local counsel for Defendant E-Health Solve, Inc. is advised of the following: The Court will not rule on #17 motion to withdraw before the deadline for responding to #9 motion to remand, unless counsel obtains consent of the client to withdraw. The response to #9 motion to remand remains due 11/5/08. See PDF document for details. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED adopting the discovery orders of the Superior Court and ORDERING compliance with said orders. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall immediately file all discovery orders of the Superior court into the record in this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Court finds #16 Application for Entry of Default to be premature; therefore, it is denied without prejudice to refiling once the jurisdictional issues are resolved. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that local counsel for Defendant E-Health Solve, Inc. shall by fax or email deliver a copy of this Order to Colorado counsel TODAY. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 10/31/08. (LSP)
October 30, 2008 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Med 4 Home, Inc.. (Messing, Jeffrey)
October 29, 2008 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by E-Health Solve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Collins, Gregory) Modified on 10/30/2008 (SAT). DOCUMENT NOT IN COMPLIANCE WITH LRCiv 7.1(c). ATTORNEY NOTICED.
October 29, 2008 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Med 4 Home, Inc. against Geriatric Services of America, Inc. and E-Health Solve, Inc. (Messing, Jeffrey) Modified on 10/30/2008 (SAT). INCORRECT EVENT TYPE SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM "MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT" TO "APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT".
October 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER (TEXT-ONLY) - IT IS ORDERED that the Motion for Expedited Briefing/Ruling (Doc. #10) is granted to the following extent: the response to the motion to remand is due by November 5, 2008, the reply to the motion to remand is due by 9:00 a.m., November 12, 2008. Entered by deputy clerk for Judge James A Teilborg on 10/29/08. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (TLB, )
October 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDARD TRACK ORDER. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 10/29/08. (Copies mailed to H. Berstein, J. Lorenz and R. Keating in Boulder, CO). Counsel shall register for electronic filings, if not already done so, within ten (10) business days. (TLB, )
October 29, 2008 Filing 13 Minute Order Pursuant to Local Rule 3.8(a), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge James A. Teilborg. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 08-1912-PHX-JAT. (MAP)
October 28, 2008 Filing 12 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
October 28, 2008 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Med 4 Home, Inc.. (Messing, Jeffrey)
October 24, 2008 Filing 10 MOTION to Expedite Motion to Remand Motion for Expedited Briefing and Ruling by Med 4 Home, Inc.. (Messing, Jeffrey)
October 24, 2008 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE ABSTAIN by Med 4 Home, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Motion to Remand)(Messing, Jeffrey)
October 23, 2008 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by E-Health Solve, Inc.. (Collins, Gregory)
October 21, 2008 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT of Supplemental Filing in Support of Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant E-Health Solve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Collins, Gregory)
October 21, 2008 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Med 4 Home, Inc.. (Messing, Jeffrey)
October 20, 2008 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by E-Health Solve, Inc. Description of deficiency: Document not in compliance with Local Rule 7.1(c). Document should be in PDF format and text-searchable. Incorrect information added to Party Information Screen. (REK)
October 20, 2008 Filing 4 Miscellaneous Document: Magistrate Removal Letter from USDC, District of Arizona (REK)
October 17, 2008 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 15 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 11/3/2008 as to Med 4 Home, Inc., Geriatric Services of America, Inc., and Health Solve, Inc. (REK)
October 17, 2008 Filing 2 Magistrate Election Form Deadline (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form)(REK)
October 17, 2008 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Edward C. Voss. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 08-1912-PHX-ECV. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Entered by REK)
October 17, 2008 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for County of Maricopa, case number cv2008-022455 Filing fee received: $ 350.00, receipt number 09700000000002305475, filed by E-Health Solve, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit 3.1, #6 Exhibit 3.2)(Collins, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Med 4 Home, Inc. v. Geriatric Services of America, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Med 4 Home Incorporated
Represented By: Jeffrey Messing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E-Health Solve Incorporated
Represented By: Gregory Blain Collins
Represented By: Howard O Bernstein,
Represented By: Jennifer L Lorenz,
Represented By: Andrew S Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geriatric Services of America Incorporated
Represented By: Garry N Keister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?