Spears et al v. Sacharow

Plaintiff: Patricia L Spears and Suzanne Ross
Defendant: Scott H Sacharow
Case Number: 2:2008cv01918
Filed: October 20, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2008 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Defendant Scott H Sacharow shall Show Cause in writing on or before 1/7/2009 why Defendant should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Court's prior order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 12/18/08. (LSP)
November 21, 2008 11 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Dft Scott H. Sacharow shall file his written election to either consent to magistrate-judge jurisdiction or elect to proceed before a United States district judge on or before Friday, 12/5/08. FURTH ER ORDERED that cnsl and any party, if unrepresented, shall hereinafter comply with the Rules of Practice for the United States District Court for the District of Arizona, as amended on 12/1/07. FURTHER ORDERED that cnsl and any party, if unrepresented, shall use the above caption, number and initials until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 11/21/08. (SAT)
November 7, 2008 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - that Plas show cause in writing on or before Friday, November 21, 2008 why Plaintiffs and/or their counsel should not be sanctioned pursuant to Title 18 U.S.C. § 401, 28 U.S.C. § 636(e) and/or the Court's inherent authority for failing to comply with the Court's prior order. If Plas comply with the Court's October 27, 2008 Order on or before 5:00 p.m. on Friday, November 21, 2008 or if Plas have already done so but its consent or election has not yet been docketed by the Clerk, the undersigned will automatically discharge and vacate this OSC without imposing any sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 11/6/08. (KMG, )
October 27, 2008 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; Plaintiffs shall file their written elections to either consent to magistrate-judge jurisdiction or elect to proceed before a US district judge on or before 11/5/08; Defendant shall file his written election within 20 days of his appearance herein or as otherwise directed by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 10/27/08. (REW, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spears et al v. Sacharow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott H Sacharow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia L Spears
Represented By: Christopher Alan LaVoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Ross
Represented By: Christopher Alan LaVoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?