Faron v. Phoenix, City of

Plaintiff: Nancy K Faron
Defendant: Phoenix, City of
Case Number: 2:2008cv01978
Filed: October 28, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:0794 Job Discrimination (Handicap)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2008 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Ex Parte Motion to Set Aside Order and Judgment of Dismissal. The Clerk is hereby directed to set aside the Judgment and reinstate this case. FURTHER ORDERED pla's counsel shall serve process on all dfts within 120 days of the filing of the Complaint. Rule 4(m). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 12/24/2008.(LAD)
November 21, 2008 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS ORDERED that Pla show cause in writing on or before Thursday, 12/4/08 why Pla and/or her cnsl should not be sanctioned pursuant to Title 18 U.S.C. § 401, 28 U.S.C. § 636(e) and/or the Court's inherent author ity for failing to comply with the Court's prior order. If Pla complies with the Court's 10/30/08 Order on or before 5:00 p.m. on Thursday, 12/4/08 or if Pla has already done so but her consent or election has not yet been docketed by the Clerk, the undersigned will automatically discharge and vacate this OSC without imposing any sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 11/21/08. (SAT)
October 30, 2008 6 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT AND ORDER; Plaintiff shall file her written election to either consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction or elect to proceed before a US district judge by 11/12/08; Defendant shall file its written election to either consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction or elect to have this case assigned to a US district judge within 20 days of its appearance herein or as otherwise directed by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 10/30/08. (REW, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faron v. Phoenix, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy K Faron
Represented By: Francis G Fanning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?