Montoya v. Schriro et al

Plaintiff: Henry Enrique Montoya, Jr
Defendant: John Doe, Austin, Guitterrez, Dora Schriro, Ken Bowers, John Does, Stacey Crabtree, Sigone, Delles, Lunka, Lopez, Montgomery and Allen
Case Number: 2:2008cv01999
Filed: October 30, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Referring Judge: Edward C Voss (PS)
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendant Austin's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 41). Defendant Austin's Motion to Dismiss 41 is granted; the Second Amended Complaint is dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust; in the alternative, it is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Local Rule of Civil Procedure 7.2(i). The Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/18/10.(DMT)
February 2, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER That Dft Schriro's Motion for Screening Order Doc. # 26 is granted; That Counts 1, 2, 3, 4, 5 and 6 of the Second Amended Complaint are dismissed for failure to state a claim; That Dfts Dora Schrio, Charles Ryan, Charles Goldsmith, Captai n Sigona, John Doe/Deputy Warden, Jane Doe/Medical Staff Nurse, John Doe/Correctional Officer and Jane Doe/Correctional Officer are dismissed from this action; That Dfts Montgomery, Allen, Austin and Cofield must answer Pla's claim in count 7 of the Second Amended Complaint. That the Clerk of Court shall send Pla a service packet including the Second Amended Complaint, this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Dfts Montgomery, Allen, Austin and Cofield; That Pla shall co mplete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 20 days of the date this order is filed. That this matter is again referred to Magistrate Judge Edward C. Voss pursuant to Local Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings. Service Packet due by 2/22/2010. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/2/10. (KMG)
July 27, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Dfts' 16 Motion for Screening Order. The 12 First Amended Complaint is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Pla has 30 days from the date of this Order to file a second amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Pl a fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal counts as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 07/27/09. (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montoya v. Schriro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guitterrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dora Schriro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sigone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lunka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Enrique Montoya, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?