Breceda v. Upgrade Concrete & Decking, LLC., et al

Plaintiff: Jose Breceda
Defendant: Upgrade Concrete & Decking, LLC., Wyatt Wade Seward and Michelle Sue Seward
Case Number: 2:2008cv02035
Filed: November 4, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Labor: Fair Standards Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE, that plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 8/28/09. (DMT, )
December 3, 2008 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 9 - that the Court's Order to Show Cause issued 11/26/08 is hereby VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 12/2/08. (KMG)
November 26, 2008 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Plaintiff to show cause in writing on or before December 4, 2008 why Plaintiff's Complaint should not be dismissed without prejudice. If Plaintiff complies with the Court's October 30, 2008 Order on or before 5:00 p.m. on December 4, 2008 or if Plaintiff has already done so but his consent or election has not yet been docketed by the Clerk, the undersigned will automatically discharge and vacate this OSC without imposing any sanctions Show Cause Response due by 12/4/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 11/25/08. (DMT, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breceda v. Upgrade Concrete & Decking, LLC., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Upgrade Concrete & Decking, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyatt Wade Seward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Sue Seward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Breceda
Represented By: Timothy Gary Tonkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?