Dema v. Allied Towing and Auto Sales Company

Plaintiff: Victor O. Dema
Defendant: Allied Towing and Auto Sales Company
Case Number: 2:2008cv02081
Filed: November 10, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 16, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Pla has until July 10, 2009 to effect service of process in this matter. The Court will not extend this service deadline absent truly extraordinary circumstances. Pla shall file an appropriate affidavit of service by July 10, 2009. The Clerk is directed to dismiss this action without prejudice if Pla fails to comply with this order. Possible Dismissal due by 7/10/2009. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/16/09. (KMG, )
February 6, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 6 Motion to pay filing fee by installments and motion to realign the parties; Plaintiff shall pay the $350 filing fee by 3/6/09; the Clerk is directed to enter dismissal of this action without further notice if Plaintiff fails to comply with this order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/6/09.(REW, )
December 9, 2008 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Pla shall pay the filing fee of $350.00 by 12/26/08. The Clerk is directed to enter dismissal of this action if Pla fails to comply with this order. Further denying 4 Motion for Recusal. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/08/08.(DNH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dema v. Allied Towing and Auto Sales Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor O. Dema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Towing and Auto Sales Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?