Jones v. General Motors Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Christopher Jones
Defendant: General Motors Corporation and Greater Glendale Automotive L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2008cv02099
Filed: November 13, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Byrider's 33 Motion to Dismiss and to Enforce Arbitration Agreement and Compel Arbitration is GRANTED. Pla is ordered to submit to arbitration consistent with the terms of the arbitration agreement, the Federal Arbit ration Act, and this Order. Pla's claims against Byrider are STAYED pending resolution of that arbitration. FURTHER ORDERED that Pla and Byrider shall file a joint status report informing the Court of the progress of arbitration by 2/14/10, and every six months thereafter. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/7/09. (SAT)
March 19, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Pla's 26 Motion for Extension of Time is denied. Pla has 30 days from the date of this Order to amend his Complaint if Pla can establish a jurisdictional basis for it. Otherwise, Pla must dismiss his Complaint and bring his claims in state court, in which there is no amount in controversy requirement. If Pla elects to file an amended complaint, Pla is ordered to specifically set out the facts underlying any new damage amount that is claimed. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 03/19/09. (ESL)
March 11, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff will file a memorandum with this Court by 5:00 p.m. on 3/20/09. Failure to timely file a responsive memorandum will be deemed consent to dismissal of the case. Possible Dismissal due by 3/20/2009.Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/11/09. (TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. General Motors Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Jones
Represented By: Shawn Louis Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greater Glendale Automotive L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?