Webb v. Arpaio et al

Plaintiff: Derric Webb
Defendant: Joseph Arpaio, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office and Maricopa County Sheriff Det. Center
Case Number: 2:2008cv02144
Filed: November 19, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prisoner - Prison Condition Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: Mark E Aspey (PS)
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 9 . Dismissing this case without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Directing the Clerk to enter Judgment. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 5/20/09. (DMT, )
April 14, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint: Recommending that that this case be dismissed for Plaintiff's failure to serve the Defendant, for Plaintiff's failure to comply with Court's Order filed 2/13/09 and his failure to respond to the Order to show cause issued 3/12/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark E Aspey on 4/13/09. (LSP)
February 13, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet): Pla's application to proceed in forma pauperis 3 is granted. Dfts Maricopa County Sheriff's Office and Maricopa County Sheriff Detention Center are dismissed from this action for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Clerk must send pla a service packet...for dft Joseph Arpaio. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Mark E. Aspey pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 USC section 636(b)(1). (See document for full details). Service Packet due by 3/5/2009. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 2/12/2009. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. Arpaio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derric Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Arpaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Sheriff Det. Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?