Colson v. Maghami, et al

Plaintiff: Barton Colson
Defendant: Javad Maghami, Marie DeBernardi Maghami, Lamborghini of Scottsdale LLC, Motor Sports of Scottsdale, Inc., Motorsports of Scottsdale No. 2, LLC and Automobili Lamborghini America, LLC
Case Number: 2:2008cv02150
Filed: November 20, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2010 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED granting in part and denying in part Pla's 148 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Jgm is granted against Motor Sports of Scottsdale for Colson's breach of contract and unjust enrichment claims. Jgm is also granted against Lamborghini of Scottsdale for Colson's unjust enrichment claim, but denied as to Mr. and Mrs. Maghami and Motor Sports of Scottsdale No. 2, LLC. Jgm is denied on the breach of good faith and fair dealing claim. Also, Colson's claims for Misrepresentation and Fraudulent Concealment will proceed against all of the Maghami Dfts except for Motor Sports of Scottsdale. FURTHER ORDERED granting Automobili Lamborghini America, LLC's 145 Motion for Summary Judgment. Automobili Lamborghini America, LLC will hereby be dismissed from this action. FURTHER ORDERED denying Pla's 154 Request for a Continuance Pursuant to Rule 56(f). Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 7/8/10. (SAT)
July 30, 2009 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 93 Motion for Order to Show Cause; denying 108 Motion for Leave to File; granting 110 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 7/29/09.(KSP)
February 17, 2009 79 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT INJUNCTION AND JUDGMENT in favor of Cross Claimants Automobili Lamborghini America, LLC, Automobili Lamborghini Holding SPA, Automobili Lamborghini SPA and against Cross Defendants Lamborghini of Scottsdale LLC, Motor Sports of Scottsdale, In c., Motorsports of Scottsdale No. 2, LLC, Javad Maghami, Marie DeBernardi Maghami. Crossdefendants are permanently enjoined and prohibited from the activities stated in this order. Within 30 calendar days of the entry date of this Consent Injunction and Judgment, the Crossdefendants shall, at their sole cost, remove all Lamborghini Trademarks from the Dealership and Website. Within 3 business days of the entry date of this Consent Injunction and Judgment, Lamborghini will pay to MotorSports the sum of $15,000 which constitutes the Deposit paid by MotorSports to Lamborghini for the Gallardo. Immediately upon receipt of the Deposit, Crossdefendants shall make the Gallardo available for return to Lamborghini at the Dealership or such oth er location as the parties may agree in writing. All parties reserve all claims, remedies and defenses to the extent not adjudicated herein, including but not limited to, Lamborghini's claims for damages and attorneys' fees under federal an d state law, Count VIII of the Crossclaim, and Crossdefendants' claims, if any, relating to the termination of the Dealer Agreement. District Court expressly reserves and retains jurisdiction to assure compliance with, and enforcement of, the terms of this Consent Injunction and Judgment. See PDF document for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 2/11/09. (LSP)
February 6, 2009 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Issuance of Provisional Remedy (Prejudgment Garnishment) with Notice, granting Plaintiff Colson's 5 Verified Emergency Application for Provisional Remedy (Garnishment); directing the Clerk to issue forthwith a Writ for Provisional Remedy (Prejudgment Garnishment) and Summons; the US Marshal shall serve and summons the Garnishees to answer under oath. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 2/5/09. (REW, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colson v. Maghami, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javad Maghami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie DeBernardi Maghami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamborghini of Scottsdale LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motor Sports of Scottsdale, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorsports of Scottsdale No. 2, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automobili Lamborghini America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barton Colson
Represented By: Sara Kathryn Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?