Alvarez v. Tracey

Petitioner: Fortino Alvarez
Respondent: Rebecca Kisto
Case Number: 2:2008cv02226
Filed: December 5, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Referring Judge: David K Duncan (PS)
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2012 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 105 . Alvarez's petition for writ of habeas corpus (Doc. 1) is denied. The Clerk of the Court shall terminate this action. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/28/12. (LAD)
March 31, 2011 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the R&R (Doc. 89) is accepted. Petitioner's motion for partial summary judgment (Doc. 74) is denied. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/31/11.(LAD)
March 16, 2010 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. ORDERED accepting the 67 R&R. FURTHER ORDERED denying 20 Motion to Dismiss Case FURTHER ORDERED granting 17 SEALED Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/15/10. (MAP)
March 4, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Federal Public Defender Daniel Kaplan is appointed to represent Petitioner in this matter. The orders denying Petitioner's 4 motion for appointment of counsel and 8 motion for reconsideration are vacated. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 03/03/09. (ESL, )
February 4, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court "VACATED PER ORDER #14 FILED ON 3/4/09" ORDER denying Petitoner's 5 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/4/09.(REW, ) Modified on 3/5/2009 (TLJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarez v. Tracey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fortino Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rebecca Kisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?